EP2830755 - METHOD FOR REVERSE PHASE CHROMATOGRAPHY OF ACTIVE PHARMACEUTICAL INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/06] | DOPED MATERIALS FOR REVERSE PHASE CHROMATOGRAPHY | ||
[2021/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeochem AG Joweid 5 8630 Rüti / CH | [2018/08] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Zeochem AG Seestrasse 108 8707 Uetikon am See / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORRER, Nicola Earhartstrasse 13/32 CH-8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | 02 /
ERDMANN, Mandy c/o Zeochem AG Seestrasse 108 CH-8707 Uetikon am See / CH | 03 /
GÉTAZ, David Rue de la Tour 53 CH-1867 Ollon / CH | 04 /
MORBIDELLI, Massimo ETH Zürich Inst. für Chemie- und Bioingenieur-Wissenschafen HCI F129 Vladimi-Prelog-Weg 1 CH-8093 Zürich / CH | 05 /
BERNARDI, Susanna Via Sicilia 5 - frazione porto I-62018 Potenza Picena (Macerata) / IT | 06 /
KHALAF, Rushd Birchstrasse 34 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Grimm, Siegfried, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Rüedi, Regula Béatrice C/o E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13713338.5 | 21.03.2013 | [2021/50] | WO2013CH00050 | Priority number, date | CH20120043912 | 28.03.2012 Original published format: CH 439122012 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013143012 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830755 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2830755 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/287, B01D15/32, B01J20/288, B01J20/32, C07K1/20 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
B01J20/288 (EP,US);
B01D15/325 (EP,US);
B01J20/287 (EP,US);
B01J20/3257 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C07K1/20 (EP,US);
B01J2220/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2015/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMKEHRPHASENCHROMATOGRAPHIE AKTIVER PHARMAZEUTISCHER SUBSTANZEN | [2021/30] | English: | METHOD FOR REVERSE PHASE CHROMATOGRAPHY OF ACTIVE PHARMACEUTICAL INGREDIENTS | [2021/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PHASE INVERSE DES COMPOSÉS PHARMACEUTIQUES ACTIVES | [2021/30] |
Former [2015/06] | DOTIERTE MATERIALIEN FÜR EINE UMKEHRPHASENCHROMATOGRAPHIE | ||
Former [2015/06] | DOPED MATERIALS FOR REVERSE PHASE CHROMATOGRAPHY | ||
Former [2015/06] | MATÉRIAUX DOPÉS DESTINÉS À LA CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PHASE INVERSE | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 06.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2021 | 15.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2013 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | MT | 15.12.2021 | NL | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IE | 21.03.2022 | LU | 21.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2011046494 (GE HEALTHCARE BIO SCIENCES AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,13,15 * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 20; example 1 * * page 14 - page 15; examples 2, 3 *; | [X]WO9009238 (BIOPROCESSING LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,13-15 * examples 2,3 * | [XD] - JIE WEI ET AL, "A new reversed-phase/strong anion-exchange mixed-mode stationary phase based on polar-copolymerized approach and its application in the enrichment of aristolochic acids", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, vol. 1246, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2012.03.047, ISSN 0021-9673, (20120322), pages 129 - 136, (20120322), XP028494990 [XD] 1-5,12,15 * Sections: "2.1. Chemicals and materials", "2.3. Synthesis of the stationary phase and column packing"; page 130, column right - page 131, column left; figure 1c * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2012.03.047 | Examination | WO2011012019 | - CROWTHER J B ET AL, "High-performance liquid chromatographic separation of oligonucleotides and other nucleic acid constituents on multifunctional stationary phases", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 282, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(00)91639-X, ISSN 0021-9673, (19831230), pages 619 - 628, (19831230), XP026484678 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)91639-X | by applicant | US7125488 | GB2074892 | GB2431399 | CN101829551 | WO2011012019 | - FAIRBANK; WIRTH, "Role of surface-adsorbed water in the horizontal polymerization of trichlorosilanes", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1999), vol. 830, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(98)00908-X, pages 285 - 291, XP004153875 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(98)00908-X | - LI; CARR; EVANS, "Studies of retention and stability of a horizontally polymerized bonded phase for reversed- phase liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2000), vol. 868, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(99)01194-2, pages 153 - 167, XP004186596 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(99)01194-2 | - WEI ET AL., "A new reversed-phase/strong anion- exchange mixed-mode stationary phase based on polar- copolymerized approach and its application in the enrichment of aristolochic acids", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2012), vol. 1246, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chroma.2012.03.047, pages 129 - 136, XP028494990 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2012.03.047 |