EP2833947 - PEN-TYPE INJECTOR WITH WINDOW ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/07] | PEN -TYPE INJECTOR WITH WINDOW ELEMENT | ||
[2017/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSMAN, Thomas Frederick Schoolhouse Farm Barnacle Warwickshire CV7 9 LG / GB | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13713443.3 | 02.04.2013 | [2018/09] | WO2013EP56854 | Priority number, date | EP20120163485 | 05.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12163485 | US201261666274P | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261666274 P | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013149980 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833947 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2833947 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/31, A61M5/142 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,RU,US);
A61M5/31 (RU);
A61M5/3129 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3125 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,US);
A61M2205/19 (US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/585 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | 05.11.2014 | ME | 05.11.2014 | Title | German: | STIFTARTIGER INJEKTOR MIT SICHTFENSTER | [2017/42] | English: | PEN-TYPE INJECTOR WITH WINDOW ELEMENT | [2017/42] | French: | INJECTEUR DE TYPE STYLO AVEC FENÊTRE | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/07] | STIFTARTIGER INJEKTOR MIT FENSTERELEMENT | ||
Former [2015/07] | PEN -TYPE INJECTOR WITH WINDOW ELEMENT | ||
Former [2015/07] | INJECTEUR DE TYPE STYLO AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE FENÊTRE | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 08.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | LU | 02.04.2018 | MT | 02.04.2018 | PL | 02.04.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
PL | 02.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
PL | 02.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
PL | 02.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0450905 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [XI]US5298023 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al); | [XI]WO9826834 (SCIENCE INC [US]); | [XI]EP0937472 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [XI]US6001082 (DAIR THOMAS M [US], et al); | [XI]WO0110484 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al); | [XI]WO02092153 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); | [XI]EP1557189 (HASELMEIER SARL [CH]); | [XI]DE102007018696 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [XI]WO2010020311 (HASELMEIER GMBH [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2010112558 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al); | by applicant | EP1920794 |