EP2861212 - NANOCERIA FOR THE TREATMENT OF OXIDATIVE STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerion, LLC One Blossom Road Rochester, New York 14610 / US | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Kenneth, Joseph 245 Thackery Road Brighton, NY 14610 / US | 02 /
COSTANZO, Wendi, Ann 1133 Frawley Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | 03 /
ERLICHMAN, Joseph, Samuel 157 Tully Road Canton, NY 13617 / US | 04 /
BELL, Eric, Leslie 674 Treasure Circle Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Coggins, Julia Frances, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13714425.9 | 15.03.2013 | [2016/49] | WO2013US32318 | Priority number, date | US201261689806P | 13.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261689806 P | US201261690100P | 18.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261690100 P | US201261795241P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261795241 P | US201261796639P | 16.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261796639 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013187980 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861212 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2861212 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K9/51, A61K33/00 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K33/244 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (KR,US);
A61K47/183 (KR,US);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61K9/1694 (KR,US);
A61K9/5123 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/16 (KR,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CERNANOPARTIKEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OXIDATIVEM STRESS | [2015/17] | English: | NANOCERIA FOR THE TREATMENT OF OXIDATIVE STRESS | [2015/17] | French: | NANOPARTICULES D'OXYDE DE CÉRIUM POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU STRESS OXYDATIF | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 21.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2013 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | LU | 15.03.2017 | MT | 15.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007002662 (EDWARD VIA VIRGINIA COLLEGE OF [US], et al) [Y] 11-14 * page 3, paragraph 9 * * page 4, paragraphs 9-11 * * pages 11-12, paragraph 49 * * page 17, paragraph 64 *; | [I]WO2008030805 (CERION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 21, line 31 * * page 22, lines 1-14 * * page 24, lines 9-31 * * page 25, lines 1-12, 19-21 * * page 27, lines 1-5, 27-31 * * page 28, lines 1-2, 22-31 * * page 29, lines 1-19 * * page 36, lines 6-7 * * page 47, lines 29-30 * * page 48, lines 1-2 * * pages 54-55; example 2 *; | [Y]US7534453 (RZIGALINSKI BEVERLY A [US], et al) [Y] 11-14 * column 1, lines 15-18, 55-56 * * column 3, lines 59-67 * * column 4, lines 6-15 * * pages 4-5; example 1 *; | [A] - Anonymous, Metallic Nanocrystallites and Their Interaction with Microbial Systems, Springer, (20120302), XP002697256 [A] 1-15 * page 57 * | by applicant | WO2007002662 | WO2008002323 | US7534453 | US2010152077 | - RZIGALINSKI, "Nanoparticles and Cell Longevity", TECHNOLOGY IN CANCER RESEARCH & TREATMENT, (2005), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 651 - 659 | - YOKEL ET AL., NANOTOXICOLOGY, (2009), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 234 - 248 | - MASUI ET AL., J. MATER. SCI. LETT., (2002), vol. 21, pages 489 - 491 | - HARDAS, TOXICOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2010), vol. 116, no. 2, pages 562 - 576 | - KARAKOTI ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2007), vol. 111, pages 17232 - 17240 | - KARAKOTI ET AL., JOM (JOURNAL OF THE MINERALS, METALS & MATERIALS SOCIETY, (2008), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 33 - 37 | - KIM ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2012), vol. 51, pages 1 - 6 | - ESTEVEZ, AY ET AL., "Neuroprotective mechanisms of cerium oxide nanoparticles in a mouse hippocampal brain slice model of ischemia", FREE RADIC. BIOL. MED., (2011), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.freeradbiomed.2011.06.006, pages 1155 - 63, XP028261540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.freeradbiomed.2011.06.006 | - HARDAS ET AL., TOXICOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2010), vol. 116, no. 2, pages 562 - 576 | WO2007US77545 |