EP2831113 - ANTIBODIES TO BRADYKININ B1 RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMINOS, Dorothea 99 Rolling Hill Drive Millington, NJ 07946 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Jie 6 Alexis Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
PRITSKER, Alla 142 Bramble Drive Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | 04 /
DAVISON, Matthew 109 Rebecca Road Whitinsville, MA 01588 / US | 05 /
BAURIN, Nicolas 35 rue de la Bretoniere 91180 Arpajon / FR | 06 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Govindan 28 Boice Lane Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Xin 6 Troy Drive Short Hills, NJ 07078-1334 / US | 08 /
LI, Han 388 Twig Lane Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2018/11] |
Former [2015/06] | 01 /
KOMINOS, Dorothea 99 Rolling Hill Drive Millington, NJ 07946 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Jie 6 Alexis Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
03 /
PRITSKER, Alla 142 Bramble Drive Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | |||
04 /
DAVISON, Matthew 50 Glen Ridge Drive Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | |||
05 /
BAURIN, Nicolas 22 Rue Du Docteur Louis Babin F-91290 Arpajon / FR | |||
06 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Govindan 28 Boice Lane Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | |||
07 /
CHEN, Xin 6 Troy Drive Short Hills, NJ 07078-1334 / US | |||
08 /
LI, Han 388 Twig Lane Yardley, PA 19067 / US | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/06] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13715049.6 | 15.03.2013 | [2018/11] | WO2013US31836 | Priority number, date | US201261616845P | 28.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261616845 P | FR20130050953 | 04.02.2013 Original published format: FR 1350953 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148296 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831113 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2831113 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/26, C07K7/18, A61K39/395, A61P29/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K47/6843 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07H21/04 (EP,US);
C07K16/22 (US);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/51 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/94 (EP,KR,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
C07K7/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | 11.09.2014 | ME | 11.09.2014 | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN BRADYKININ-B1-REZEPTORLIGANDEN | [2015/06] | English: | ANTIBODIES TO BRADYKININ B1 RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2015/06] | French: | ANTICORPS DIRIGÉS CONTRE LES LIGANDS DES RÉCEPTEURS B1 DE LA BRADYKININE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17179380.5 / EP3246339 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - BEDI G S ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies to bradykinin inhibit smooth muscle contractile action of bradykinin", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, vol. 842, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0304-4165(85)90298-3, ISSN 0304-4165, (19850927), pages 90 - 99, (19850927), XP025852771 [X] 1-4,24-28,30-34 * paragraph [results]; table 1 * * page 97, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 1-41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4165(85)90298-3 | [I] - U. HILGENFELDT ET AL, "Strategy of Measuring Bradykinin and Kallidin and Their Concentration in Plasma and Urine", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (19950601), vol. 228, no. 1, doi:10.1006/abio.1995.1311, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 35 - 41, XP055064491 [I] 1-41 * page 36, paragraph r; table 1 * * page 38, paragraph r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1995.1311 | [I] - CARRETERO O A ET AL, "Measurement of urinary kallikrein activity by kinin radioimmunoassay", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, vol. 25, no. 20, doi:10.1016/0006-2952(76)90008-3, ISSN 0006-2952, (19761015), pages 2265 - 2270, (19761015), XP025509763 [I] 1-41 * page 2266, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(76)90008-3 | [A] - GEPPETTI P ET AL, "Kallidin applied to the human nasal mucosa produces algesic response not blocked by capsaicin desensitization", REGULATORY PEPTIDES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, NL, vol. 33, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0167-0115(91)90234-8, ISSN 0167-0115, (19910517), pages 321 - 329, (19910517), XP025208931 [A] 35,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-0115(91)90234-8 | by applicant | EP0239400 | US4741900 | WO8807089 | US4816567 | US4816397 | WO8912624 | EP0396387 | WO9109967 | WO9114438 | WO9208495 | EP0519596 | US5225539 | EP0592106 | US5314995 | US5460785 | WO9614339 | US5530101 | US5565332 | US5585089 | US5639641 | US5648260 | WO9805787 | US5739277 | WO9823289 | US5807715 | US5834250 | WO9852976 | US5869046 | WO9951642 | WO9958572 | WO0009560 | WO0032767 | WO0034317 | WO0042072 | US6096871 | US6121022 | US6194551 | US6193980 | US6242195 | US6277375 | WO0244215 | WO02060919 | US6528624 | US6538124 | WO03074569 | WO2004016750 | WO2004029207 | WO2004035752 | US6737056 | WO2004063351 | WO2004074455 | WO2004099249 | US6821505 | WO2005018572 | WO2005040217 | WO2005047327 | WO2005070963 | WO2005077981 | WO2005092925 | WO2005123780 | US6998253 | WO2006019447 | WO2006047350 | US7083784 | WO2006085967 | WO2009032661 | US2011027266 | - KABAT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 252, pages 6609 - 6616 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745 | - BRUMMELL ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 32, pages 1180 - 1187 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1999), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 879 - 884 | - BURKS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 412 - 417 | - RICHARDSON JS., "The anatomy and taxonomy of protein structure", ADV PROTEIN CHEM., (1981), vol. 34, pages 167 - 339 | - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 1202 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - GILLIES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, pages 851 - 855 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 604 - 608 | - TAKEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 452 - 454 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4/5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA. ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - KUNDU ET AL., BIOPHYS J, (2002), vol. 83, pages 723 - 732 | - FREEDBERG ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1998), vol. 120, no. 31, pages 7916 - 7923 | - CASE ET AL., J COMP CHEM, (2005), vol. 26, pages 1668 - 1688 | - BROOKS ET AL., J COMP CHEM, (1983), vol. 4, pages 187 - 217 | - MACKERELL ET AL., The Encyclopedia of Computational Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1998), vol. 1, pages 271 - 177 | - RIZZO ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (2000), vol. 122, no. 51, pages 12898 - 12900 | - STRUCTURE, (2000), vol. 8, pages R137 - R142 | - PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 11, pages 184 - 187 | - SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, pages 1362 - 1367 | - STRUCTURE, (2006), vol. 14, pages 683 - 693 | - DRUG DEV RES, (2004), vol. 61, pages 137 - 154 | - J CHROMATOG, (2006), vol. 837, pages 35 - 43 | - PLOS BIOL, (2005), vol. 3, no. 3, page E9 | - LEONG, S. R. ET AL., CYTOKINE, (2001), vol. 16, page 106 | - ADV. IN DRUG DELIV. REV., (2002), vol. 54, page 531 | - WEIR ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANSACTIONS, (2002), vol. 30, page 512 | - GENTZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824 | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 767 | - "Mammalian Expression Vectors", RIDGWAY, A. A. G, Vectors, BUTTERWORTHS, (1988), pages 470 - 472 | - STINCHCOMB ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 282, page 39 | - KINGSMAN ET AL., GENE, (1979), vol. 7, page 141 | - TSCHEMPER ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 10, page 157 | - JONES, GENETICS, (1977), vol. 85, page 12 | - PEIRERSZ ET AL., IMMUNOL. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 65, pages 111 - 125 | - D.N. GLOVER, DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, (1985), vol. I, II | - MOE, (2009), vol. 10 | - BERMAN, H.M; WESTBROOK J.; FENG. Z.; GILLILAND, G.; BHAT, T.N.; WEISSIG, H.; SHINDYALOV, I.N.; BOURNE, P.E., THE PROTEIN DATA BANK, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, pages 235 - 242 | - E. MONSELLIER; H. BEDOUELLE., J. MOL. BIOL., (2006), vol. 362, pages 580 - 593 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 487 - 499 | - E. MONSELLIER; H. BEDOUELLE, J. MOL. BIOL., (2006), vol. 362, pages 580 - 593 | - B.J. STEIPE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (1994), vol. 240, pages 188 - 192 | - SECO J; LUQUE FJ; BARRIL X., J MED CHEM., (20090423), vol. 52, no. 8, pages 2363 - 71 | - MALIN JONSSON ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2003), vol. 107, pages 5511 - 5518 | - PETER T. JONES; PAUL H. DEAR; JEFFERSON FOOTE; MICHAEL S. NEUBERGER; GREG WINTER, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - FOOTE; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 487 - 499 | - VITA R; ZAREBSKI L; GREENBAUM JA; EMAMI H; HOOF; SALIMI N; DAMLE R; SETTE A; PETERS B., "The immune epitope database 2.0.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20091111), vol. 38 | - RICHARDSON JS, "The anatomy and taxonomy of protein structure", ADV PROTEIN CHEM., (1981), vol. 34, pages 167 - 339 | - SADDI GM; ABBOTT FV., PAIN, (2000), vol. 89, pages 53 - 63 | - CHEN ET AL., MOLECULAR PAIN, (2010), vol. 2, pages 6 - 13 | - BENNETT GJ; XIE YK., PAIN, (1988), vol. 33, pages 87 - 107 | US19990259337 | US19990259338 |