EP2834696 - LASER PROJECTOR SYSTEM WITH GRAPHICAL POINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states THOMSON LICENSING 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Technicolor USA, Inc. 101 W. 103rd Street, INH3340 Indianapolis, IN 46290 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUMREICH, Mark Francis 10308 Indian Lake Blvd S Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US | 02 /
HAILEY, James Edwin 12025 Watermark Court Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies 12 place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13715105.6 | 27.03.2013 | WO2013US34007 | Priority number, date | US201261617758P | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261617758 P | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148770 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834696 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10, G02B27/20, H04N9/31 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
G02B27/20 (EP,US);
G02B26/101 (EP,US);
G02B26/103 (US);
G02B26/105 (US);
H04N9/3129 (EP,US);
H04N9/3135 (EP,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Title | German: | LASERPROJEKTORSYSTEM MIT EINEM GRAFISCHEN ZEIGER | [2015/07] | English: | LASER PROJECTOR SYSTEM WITH GRAPHICAL POINTER | [2015/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROJECTEUR LASER AVEC POINTEUR GRAPHIQUE | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2019/34] | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008129892 (SAKAGUCHI RYUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,11,18-20 * figures 1A, 1B, 2 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049] ** paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0070] *; | [X]US2011286050 (WAKABAYASHI SHUICHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,11,18-20 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1, 2, 5A, 5B, 8A, 8B * |