EP2830897 - CABIN AIR SUPPLY DUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ, Philippe 66 Ave René Descartes F-91080 Courcouronnes / FR | 02 /
PHILIPPE, Vincent 4 Rue Alfred de Vigny F-78960 Voisins Le Bretonneux / FR | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13715335.9 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013FR50554 | Priority number, date | FR20120052734 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: FR 1252734 | [2015/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144480 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830897 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/28 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP);
B60H1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | ZULUFTLEITUNG FÜR KABINE | [2015/06] | English: | CABIN AIR SUPPLY DUCT | [2015/06] | French: | CONDUIT D'ALIMENTATION D'AIR HABITACLE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 09.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004039442 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0026] - [0055] , [0077] , [0083] , [0092]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]JPH1058951 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1775200 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0025] - [0032]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1854681 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRON & COMP [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0014]; figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2010146306 | FR2895354 |