EP2834715 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reis Group Holding GmbH & Co. KG Walter-Reis-Str. 1 63785 Obernburg / DE | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOM, Franz Neffeberg 18 64750 Lützelbach / DE | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/07] | Application number, filing date | 13715666.7 | 05.04.2013 | [2016/21] | WO2013EP57187 | Priority number, date | DE201210103031 | 05.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012103031 | [2015/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013150134 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834715 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2834715 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, B25J9/16 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
B25J9/1656 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B25J13/06 (KR);
G05B19/409 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B25J9/161 (KR,US);
G05B2219/23377 (KR);
G05B2219/23378 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEDIENUNG EINES INDUSTRIEROBOTERS | [2015/07] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | [2015/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN ROBOT INDUSTRIEL | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2013 | AL | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | MT | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | IS | 25.09.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10146782 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039]; figure 12 *; | [Y]DE10303793 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] *; | [Y]US2009289591 (KASSOW KRISTIAN [DK], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6,9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * claims 1,9,13,14,39,41 *; | [Y] - SONICWAVEZOR, "Using iPod Touch to control NASA Robot over wifi", INTERNET CITATION, (20100324), page 1, URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=4XQeZE4nh6M, (20110727), XP002653593 [Y] 1-4,6,8 * the whole document * | [Y] - Martin Edberg ET AL, "Implementing Multi-Touch Screen for Real-time Control of a Robotic cell At Universidad Politécnica de Valencia", Göteborg, Sweden, (20101231), URL: http://publications.lib.chalmers.se/records/fulltext/126887.pdf, (20130704), XP055069550 [Y] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * Abschnitt 3.1;3.2;5.1;5.1.2;9 * | [YD] - Christoph Niederhuber, "Bedienpanel: Multitouch-Technologie mit haptischen Elementen vereint", Fertigungs- & Maschinenautomation, etz, (20120229), URL: http://www.etz.de/files/e20223zfe_keba.pdf, (20130704), XP055069655 [YD] 1,7 * page 1; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1035953 | US2008165255 | DE102010025781 | DE102010039540 | - NIEDERHUBER, CH., "Bedienpanel: Multitouch-Technologie mit Haptischen Elementen vereint", ELEKTROTECHNIK + AUTOMATION, (2012), pages 2 - 4 |