EP2836466 - CARTRIDGE FOR THE TREATMENT OF DRINKING WATER AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING DRINKING WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BWT water+more GmbH Walter-Simmer-Str. 4 5310 Mondsee / AT | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANN, Jürgen Hauptstrasse 150 69226 Nußloch / DE | 02 /
BISSEN, Monique Schoberstrasse 14 5310 Mondsee / AT | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Friderichs, Gunther, et al Augspurger Tesch Friderichs Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Kaiserstraße 39 55116 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Blumbach Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13715674.1 | 09.04.2013 | WO2013EP57397 | Priority number, date | DE20121007150 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012007150 | [2015/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013153068 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836466 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/42, C02F1/68, B01J47/02, B01J39/04 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
B01J47/026 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (US);
B01J39/05 (EP,US);
B01J39/07 (EP,US);
B01J47/012 (EP,US);
B01J47/024 (EP,US);
B01J47/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/003 (EP,US);
C02F1/68 (EP,US);
C02F2001/425 (EP,US);
C02F2101/10 (US);
C02F2201/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE ZUR TRINKWASSERAUFBEREITUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON TRINKWASSER | [2015/08] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR THE TREATMENT OF DRINKING WATER AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING DRINKING WATER | [2015/08] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU POTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU POTABLE | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | 30.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3304152 (BRODALLA DIETER DIPL CHEM) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10020437 (HONEYWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP2263503 (AQUIS WASSER LUFT SYSTEME GMBH [CH]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5,6,9,10; | [A]WO2011101483 (STRUTTURA S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XPA]WO2012107916 (STRUTTURA S R L [IT], et al) [XP] 1,4,7,8 * page 10, lines 11-21 *[A] 2,3,5,6,9,10 | Examination | US2008230451 | by applicant | EP2094611 |