EP2829049 - CLUSTERING OF AUDIO STREAMS IN A 2D/3D CONFERENCE SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103-4813 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUSTEAD, Paul c/o Dolby Australia Pty. Ltd. Level 3 35 Mitchell Street McMahons Point New South Wales 2060 / AU | 02 /
JOHNSTON, Craig c/o Dolby Australia Pty. Ltd. Level 3 35 Mitchell Street McMahons Point New South Wales 2060 / AU | 03 /
NGUYEN, Vinh Unit 18, 173-179 Princes Highway Kogarah, NSW - 2217 / AU | 04 /
SPITTLE, Gary c/o Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, California 94103-4813 / US | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 13715830.9 | 21.03.2013 | [2021/21] | WO2013US33219 | Priority number, date | US201261614597P | 23.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261614597 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013142642 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829049 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2829049 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/56 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
H04M3/568 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
H04S7/302 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRUPPIERUNG VON AUDIOSTRÖMEN IN EINER 2D/3D-KONFERENZSZENE | [2015/05] | English: | CLUSTERING OF AUDIO STREAMS IN A 2D/3D CONFERENCE SCENE | [2015/05] | French: | GROUPAGE DE FLUX AUDIO DANS UNE SCÈNE DE CONFÉRENCE BIDIMENSIONNELLE /TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 15.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2020 | 17.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2013 | AL | 26.05.2021 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | TR | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
TR | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007263823 (JALAVA TEEMU [FI], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0056] *; | [A]US2008260131 (AKESSON LINUS [SE]) [A] 1-30 * figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]WO2008143561 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 27 * * page 10, line 1 - page 30, line 5 *; | [X]WO2010040408 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-30 * page 1, line 9 - page 7, line 19 * * page 9, line 6 - page 21, line 29 * * figures 4,5,6a-6b, 7a,7b,8a-8d,9a-9c,11,12,13a,13b *; | [A] - HAUN MICHAEL ET AL, "3DTel - A Spatial Audio Teleconferencing System", CONFERENCE: 44TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: AUDIO NETWORKING; NOVEMBER 2011, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20111118), XP040567688 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0659006 |