01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
04.10.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
26.10.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] |
24.10.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.10.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.09.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
01.09.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
01.09.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
13.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
30.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.12.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.07.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2016 |
First examination report |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.07.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
01.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
13.02.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
07.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.12.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
06.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|