EP2836398 - SELF-CURLING NON-WOVEN SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc. 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield, MI 48033 / US | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hiroki 4-21-6-502 Minami-ku Kamitsuruma Hon-chou Sagamihara Kanagawa 252-3318 / JP | 02 /
SATOH, Kouichi 4-9-8-2408 Haramachida Machida Tokyo 194-0013 / JP | 03 /
LAURENT, Benoit 39 Rue Marillac F-60350 Trosly Breuil / FR | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Lessard, Jason Donat, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Withworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2015/08] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13716694.8 | 04.04.2013 | [2016/30] | WO2013US35187 | Priority number, date | US201261622788P | 11.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261622788 P | US201313793397 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313793397 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013154890 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836398 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836398 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H02G3/04, F16L57/06 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
B65D81/03 (EP,US);
F16L57/04 (EP,CN,US);
B65D65/02 (US);
B65D85/08 (EP,US);
F16L57/06 (EP,CN,US);
H01B7/0045 (US);
H01B7/1805 (US);
H02G3/0468 (EP,CN,US);
H02G3/0481 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTEINROLLENDE MUFFE AUS VLIESSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION DAVON | [2015/08] | English: | SELF-CURLING NON-WOVEN SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF | [2015/08] | French: | MANCHON NON TISSÉ À BOUCLAGE PROPRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 29.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2013 | AL | 27.07.2016 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | GB | 04.04.2017 | IE | 04.04.2017 | LU | 04.04.2017 | MT | 04.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
MT | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
MT | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
MT | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
MT | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
MT | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO03060373 (FEDERAL MOGUL POWERTRAIN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-13 * page 7, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3,6 * [A] 14,20 [I] 6-9; | [XI]GB2342708 (FEDERAL MOGUL TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,10-13 * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraphs 2,3 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6-9; | [XI]DE19856605 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13 * figures 1,2; claims 1,7,8 * [I] 3,8,9; | [A]US2011275268 (HARRIS DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1,10,14,20 * paragraphs [0042] , [0045]; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2365220 (FEDERAL MOGUL TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10,14,20 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-3,10-12 *; | [AD]US7523532 (YAMAGUCHI HIROKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1,10,14,20 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19716232 (ZIPPER TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 10,20 * column 4, lines 41-66; figures 6,7 * | by applicant | US7523532 | US7754301 |