EP2825339 - METHOD AND DEBURRING TOOL FOR DEBURRING IN PARTICULAR NON-ROUND RECESSES IN WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/04] | DEBURRING TOOL FOR DEBURRING IN PARTICULAR NON-ROUND RECESSES IN WORKPIECES | ||
[2023/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 12.03.2025 [2025/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heule Werkzeug AG Wegenstrasse 11 9436 Balgach / CH | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÄSSLER, Roman Staatsstrasse 16 CH-9437 Marbach SG / CH | 02 /
HEULE, Heinrich Kristallstrasse 6 CH-9434 Au SG / CH | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2015/04] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 13717158.3 | 14.03.2013 | [2023/33] | WO2013EP00763 | Priority number, date | DE20121005246 | 14.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012005246 | [2015/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013135383 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825339 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825339 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/10, B23D79/02 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B23B51/101 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23D79/023 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23B29/034 (KR);
B23B51/10 (KR);
B23B51/102 (US);
B23D79/06 (KR);
B23B2251/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
Y10T407/134 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENTGRATWERKZEUG ZUR ENTGRATUNG VON INSBESONDERE UNRUNDEN AUSNEHMUNGEN IN WERKSTÜCKEN | [2023/16] | English: | METHOD AND DEBURRING TOOL FOR DEBURRING IN PARTICULAR NON-ROUND RECESSES IN WORKPIECES | [2023/16] | French: | METHODE ET OUTIL D'ÉBARBAGE PERMETTANT D'ÉBARBER DES TROUS QUI NE SONT NOTAMMENT PAS RONDS DANS DES PIÈCES | [2023/16] |
Former [2015/04] | ENTGRATWERKZEUG ZUR ENTGRATUNG VON INSBESONDERE UNRUNDEN AUSNEHMUNGEN IN WERKSTÜCKEN | ||
Former [2015/04] | DEBURRING TOOL FOR DEBURRING IN PARTICULAR NON-ROUND RECESSES IN WORKPIECES | ||
Former [2015/04] | OUTIL D'ÉBARBAGE PERMETTANT D'ÉBARBER DES TROUS QUI NE SONT NOTAMMENT PAS RONDS DANS DES PIÈCES | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 19.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | GB | 14.03.2024 | IE | 14.03.2024 | LU | 14.03.2024 | BE | 31.03.2024 | CH | 31.03.2024 | [2025/11] |
Former [2025/10] | BG | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
GB | 14.03.2024 | ||
IE | 14.03.2024 | ||
LU | 14.03.2024 | ||
BE | 31.03.2024 | ||
Former [2025/09] | BG | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
GB | 14.03.2024 | ||
LU | 14.03.2024 | ||
BE | 31.03.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | BG | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2024 | ||
BE | 31.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/52] | BG | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/51] | BG | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008083646 (BEIER ENTGRATTECHNIK DR [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,7,9-11; | [X]DE102007020207 (BEIER HANS-MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,5,8* the whole document * | Examination | EP1075888 |