EP2834276 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING VINYL ESTER POLYMERS HAVING SPECIFICALLY SETTABLE DISPERSITY AND LOW POLYDISPERSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZECHA, Helmut Tittmoninger Straße 41 84489 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
WEITZEL, Hans-Peter Sonnenstraße 8 84571 Reischach / DE | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Ege, Markus, et al Wacker Chemie AG Gisela-Stein-Straße 1 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Ege, Markus, et al Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/07] | Ege, Markus, et al Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 DE-81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13717204.5 | 02.04.2013 | [2016/07] | WO2013EP56892 | Priority number, date | DE201210205455 | 03.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012205455 | [2015/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013150001 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834276 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2834276 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/20, C08F2/22 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
C08F2/20 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (US);
C04B24/2623 (EP,US);
C04B26/04 (EP,US);
C08F2/22 (EP,US);
C09D131/04 (EP,US);
C09J131/04 (EP,US);
C04B2103/0057 (EP,US);
C04B2103/408 (EP,US);
C08L2201/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VINYLESTERPOLYMEREN MIT GEZIELT EINSTELLBARER DISPERSITÄT BEI GERINGER POLYDISPERSITÄT | [2015/07] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING VINYL ESTER POLYMERS HAVING SPECIFICALLY SETTABLE DISPERSITY AND LOW POLYDISPERSITY | [2015/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMÈRES D'ESTERS DE VINYLE AYANT UNE DISPERSITÉ AJUSTABLE DE MANIÈRE CIBLÉE EN MÊME TEMPS QU'UNE FAIBLE POLYDISPERSITÉ | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 28.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2013 | AL | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | MT | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | RS | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | IE | 02.04.2016 | LU | 02.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 02.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
MT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 02.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
MT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 02.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YDA]DE1029565 (HOECHST AG) [YD] 1-8 * example -; claim - * [A] 9-13; | [A]EP0899281 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * example 1; claim - *; | [XY]WO2004065437 (WACKER POLYMER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 9-13 * example -; claim - * [Y] 1-8; | [AD]EP1788001 (WACKER POLYMER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-13* example 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE102006037317 (CELANESE EMULSIONS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [A]DE102007021776 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0072]; example -; claim - *; | [XDY]DE102009008143 (CELANESE EMULSIONS GMBH [DE]) [XD] 9-13 * paragraph [0024] * * example -; claim - * [Y] 1-8 | by applicant | DE1029565 | GB857514 | DE1260145 | DE1595402 | DE2837992 | DE3036696 | DE3147008 | DE3227090 | EP0224169 | EP0789035 | US5679735 | DE19962566 | DE10035589 | EP1215219 | EP1262465 | EP1420033 | DE10337183 | EP1788001 | DE102006037317 | DE102009008143 | - FIKENTSCHER, CELLULOSECHEMIE, (1932), vol. 13, page 58 |