EP2836459 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE IN THE COMBUSTION FURNACE OF A CLAUS UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIELERT, Holger Westerwikstrasse 38 44379 Dortmund / DE | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Duda, Rafael Thomas ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | ThyssenKrupp AG - IP Services CO-TIS/IPS ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13717429.8 | 27.03.2013 | WO2013EP00912 | Priority number, date | DE20121007161 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012007161 | [2015/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013152831 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836459 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/04, C21B13/00 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
C01B17/0413 (EP,US);
C01B17/0447 (US);
C01B17/0417 (US);
C01B17/0452 (EP,US);
C21B13/0073 (EP,US);
Y02P10/134 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DER TEMPERATUR IM VERBRENNUNGSOFEN EINER CLAUS-ANLAGE | [2015/08] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE IN THE COMBUSTION FURNACE OF A CLAUS UNIT | [2015/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE DANS LE FOUR DE COMBUSTION D'UNE UNITÉ CLAUS | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 30.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/13] | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE2246885 (THYSSEN NIEDERRHEIN AG) [YD] 7,8* the whole document *; | [XY]US4756900 (PENDERGRAFT PAUL T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 4, line 27 - line 44; figure 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]US4798716 (PALM JOHN W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, lines 9,60-68; figure .; claim - * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]EP0568980 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 4, line 3 - line 8; figure 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [A]EP0838429 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XY]US7172746 (RISCHARD RUSSELL D [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 12; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]GB2467930 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 18, line 29 - page 19, line 2; figure 4; claims 1,3-5,9 * [Y] 7,8 | by applicant | DE2246885 | US4085199 | CA1139531 | WO0130692 |