EP2800851 - A SCAFFOLD WITH AN AUTOMATIC INSTALLATION CHARACTERISTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fenerci, Abdurrahman Murat Yesilova Mh. Kucuk Camlica Sk. No:43 Osmangazi 16250 Bursa / TR | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Dereligil, Ersin, et al Destek Patent, Inc. Konak Mah. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Blok No: 36/5 16110 Besevler Nilufer Bursa / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Iskender, Ibrahim Destek Patent, Inc. Konak Mah. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Block No: 36/5 Besevler Nilüfer 16110 Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 13717589.9 | 16.01.2013 | [2015/37] | WO2013TR00004 | Priority number, date | TR20120001326 | 06.02.2012 Original published format: TR 201201326 | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013119189 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2800851 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800851 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/34, E04G1/17, E04G5/00, E04G1/15 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
E04G1/34 (EP,US);
E04G1/17 (US);
E04G5/007 (EP,US);
E04G2001/157 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/46] | E04G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÜST MIT EINER FUNKTION FÜR AUTOMATISCHE INSTALLATION | [2014/46] | English: | A SCAFFOLD WITH AN AUTOMATIC INSTALLATION CHARACTERISTIC | [2014/46] | French: | ÉCHAFAUDAGE AYANT UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'INSTALLATION AUTOMATIQUE | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2013 | AL | 09.09.2015 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | RS | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | IE | 16.01.2016 | LU | 16.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2796299 (FREEMAN GEORGE D) [Y] 2,6,7,17 * column 1, line 15 - line 19; figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 69 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 21 - line 25 * [A] 1,8,13,15; | [A]US3871478 (BUSHNELL JR SHERMAN W) [A] 1,15 * figures 1,8,9 *; | [YA]EP0142963 (REED HENRY) [Y] 5 * page 5, line 15 - line 18; figure 4 * * page 6, line 23 - line 26 * [A] 1,3,4,12,15; | [XYI]WO9527836 (VIANDON MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1,3,11-13,15,16 * page 1, line 13 - line 19; figures 1,6,7,8 * * page 2, line 17 - line 19 * * page 3, line 5 - line 8 * * page 4, line 18 - line 22 * [Y] 2,5-7,17 [I] 4,8-10,14; | [A]GB2323623 (CORLETT ANTONY JOHN [GB]) [A] 1,15* figure 4 * | by applicant | TR19990000311 | EP20070001953 |