EP2859376 - WIDEBAND LOW LATENCY REPEATER AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2017/20] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870, Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAVAGE, Lee, M. 1635 La Vista Del Oceano Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | 02 /
HENRY, James, E. 248 Iris Avenue Goleta, CA 93117-2040 / US | 03 /
BECKER, Jeffrey, J. 7524 Carlisle Way Goleta, CA 93117-1942 / US | 04 /
WILSON, David, Brent 402 Baldwin Road Santa Barbara, CA 93105 / US | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13717630.1 | 29.03.2013 | [2017/20] | WO2013US34644 | Priority number, date | US201213492625 | 08.06.2012 Original published format: US201213492625 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013184232 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859376 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2859376 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/02, G01S7/38 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G01S7/021 (EP,US);
G01S7/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREITBANDIGE ZWISCHENVERSTÄRKER MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZ UND VERFAHREN | [2015/16] | English: | WIDEBAND LOW LATENCY REPEATER AND METHODS | [2015/16] | French: | RÉPÉTEUR À FAIBLE LATENCE LARGE BANDE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2013 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.03.2013 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.03.2013 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4318183 (BYINGTON ROY E, et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 21 *; | [X]EP1039716 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,10-12,17,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0050]; claim 3 *; | [A]US6624780 (FOUTS DOUGLAS JAI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 47 *; | [X]US2004178944 (RICHARDSON DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-13,18-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0000] , [0010] , [0034] , [0064]; claims 1,4,5,6 *; | [X]US2008198060 (SHANI MOSHE [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13,16-20 * paragraphs [0042] , [0044] , [0060] - [0066]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2008266152 (DURTSCHI ROGER DEAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0025] - [0027]; figure 2; claim 1 * |