|
14.09.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2016 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2015 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
03.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Invitation to correct priority claim |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |