Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015068556 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | WO2013EP56333 | 26.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4080553 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | C0 | EP4080553 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B1 | EP4080553 | 26.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | EP13717727 | 26.03.2013 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | WO2013EP56333 | 26.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104272448 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | WO2013EP56333 | 26.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2831910 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP2831910 | 04.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | WO2013EP56333 | 26.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2081MUMNP2014 | 21.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | WO2013EP56333 | 26.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2630520 | 11.09.2017 | C2 | RU2014142308 | 20.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | WO2013EP56333 | 26.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013144108 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012103330 | 02.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012103330 | 17.04.2012 | DE102012102740 | 29.03.2012 | Type | Divisional application | EP4080553 |