Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2834515
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.08.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
12.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
07.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.05.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.02.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.07.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2018 |
First examination report |
|
13.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.06.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
09.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2015 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
09.01.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
09.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
08.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|