EP2870095 - ROLL SUPPLY SYSTEM OF A WEB-FED PRINTING PRESS, WEB-FED PRINTING PRESS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A ROLL SUPPLY SYSTEM OF A WEB-FED PRINTING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMTHOR, Paul Lindenweg 14 97225 Zellingen / DE | 02 /
MECKELEIN, Philipp Furtweg 6 97292 Uettingen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Klaus Hans-Bolza-Str. 2 97855 Triefenstein-OT Trennfeld / DE | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13718162.4 | 17.04.2013 | [2016/24] | WO2013EP57963 | Priority number, date | DE201210211708 | 05.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012211708 | [2015/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014005732 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870095 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2870095 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65H26/00, B65H19/12 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP,CN);
B65H26/00 (EP,CN);
B65H2301/41702 (EP,CN);
B65H2407/10 (EP,CN);
B65H2551/18 (EP,CN);
B65H2553/416 (EP,CN);
B65H2801/21 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLENVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM EINER ROLLENDRUCKMASCHINE, ROLLENDRUCKMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEDIENUNG EINES ROLLENVERSORGUNGSSYSTEMS EINER ROLLENDRUCKMASCHINE | [2015/20] | English: | ROLL SUPPLY SYSTEM OF A WEB-FED PRINTING PRESS, WEB-FED PRINTING PRESS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A ROLL SUPPLY SYSTEM OF A WEB-FED PRINTING PRESS | [2015/20] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AMENÉE DE ROULEAUX D'UNE PRESSE ROTATIVE, PRESSE ROTATIVE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU SYSTÈME D'AMENÉE DE ROULEAUX D'UNE PRESSE ROTATIVE | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2018
24.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE manroland Goss web systems GmbH Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | 02
15.03.2017
24.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE Contiweb B.V. Ingenieur Wagterstraat 10 5831AZ Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/38] |
Former [2019/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2017
24.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE manroland web systems GmbH Intellectual Property Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
02
15.03.2017
24.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE Contiweb B.V. Ingenieur Wagterstraat 10 5831AZ Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE manroland web systems GmbH Intellectual Property Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
02
15.03.2017
Goss Contiweb B.V. Ir. Wagterstraat 10 5831 AZ Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2017
manroland web systems GmbH Intellectual Property Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | 28.04.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.09.2019 | 11.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.06.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/16] | 17.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2013 | AL | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | IE | 17.04.2017 | LU | 17.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | AT | 17.04.2018 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2017 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102010031650 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0088] * * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1644191 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]DE4135001 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 12-63 *; | [A]EP0390735 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 14 * * column 5, lines 24-33 *; | [A]WO2004031873 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 1st - page 6, paragraph 2nd * * page 9, paragraph 2nd * * page 10, line 3rd * * page 13, paragraph 3rd *; | [A]EP1876126 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2012078576 (STARKL JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * | by applicant | WO2011088905 | DE102010001014 | WO2005080241 | DE102007025800 | EP1986942 | EP1644191 | DE29500873U | DE102004038906 | DE102005030829 | DE102010031650 | DE102010028289 | DE102010028292 | JPS62157160 | Opposition | DE102010031650 | EP0390735 | EP1644191 | DE4135001 | US2012078576 | EP1876126 | WO2004031873 | DE102010001014 | DE10325853 | EP1147895 | DE102010028289 | JPS62157160 | DE202010017198U | DE102010028292 | DE3910444 | - "KBA Pastomat", Koenig & Bauer AG, (20080400), pages 1 - 12, XP055363951 | - "Fördertechnik für Papierrollen", Wolfgang Walenski, Der Rollen Offset Druck, (19950000), pages 292 - 301, ISBN 3931436012, XP055363958 | - "Drucktechnologien mit fester Druckform", Helmut Kipphan, Handbuch der Printmeiden, (20000000), pages 272 - 278, ISBN 3540669418, XP055363962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-57024-7_2 | - "Rollenwechsler FD - Hilfe-Funktion H21.00.0302", Contiweb, (20080300), XP055364898 | - "Rollenwechsler und Rollentransportsysteme - Sicherheitsanleitung", Contiweb, (20071200), XP055364887 | - "KBA Pastomat - Hightech-Rollenwechsler für die integrierte Papierlogistik im Zeitungs- und Akzidenzdruck", Koenig & Bauer AG, (20080400), XP055364889 | - "Handbook of print media: technologies and production methods", Helmut Kipphan, Handbook of print media: technologies and production methods, (20010000), pages 154 - 157, ISBN 3-540-67326-1, XP055364892 | - "MPS Roll Handling: das automatisierte System für Rollenlogistik und -verfolgung", ABB Schweiz AG, (20100000), XP055364896 |