EP2805452 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING CHARGING CONTROL TO APPLICATION- LAYER DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiang Yang Lucent Tech China Tower C Wangjing Science Techn No.2 Li Ze Zhong Road Chao Yang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Yigang Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 9G-125 1960 Lucent Ln Naperville, Illinois 60563-1594 / US | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13718372.9 | 21.01.2013 | WO2013IB00527 | Priority number, date | CN20121020081 | 21.01.2012 Original published format: CN201210020081 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013108138 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805452 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04W4/26 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04L12/1407 (EP,US);
H04L43/028 (EP,US);
H04L45/3065 (US);
H04M15/66 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04L12/1467 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER VERRECHNUNGSKONTROLLE BEI EINER DATEN AUF ANWENDUNGSEBENE | [2014/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING CHARGING CONTROL TO APPLICATION- LAYER DATA | [2014/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR EFFECTUER UN CONTRÔLE DE FACTURATION SUR DES DONNÉES DE COUCHE D'APPLICATION | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 02.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010142373 (JIN HAIPENG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] *; | [A]WO2011012165 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 34 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 6 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 9 *; | [I]EP2296309 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * column 2, line 5 - line 6 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 17 * * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 3 *; | [XPI]WO2012077073 (ALLOT COMMUNICATIONS LTD [IL], et al) [XP] 1,10-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0116] * * page 23, line 4 - line 5 * * paragraph [0143] *[I] 2-9; | [I] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Policy solutions and enhancements (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.813, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110610), vol. SA WG2, no. V11.0.0, pages 1 - 41, XP050552994 [I] 1-15 * page 15, paragraph 4.3 - paragraph 4.3.1.1 * * page 18, paragraph 4.3.2.2.2.2 - page 19, paragraph 4.3.2.2.2.3.1 * * page 22, paragraph 4.3.2.2.2.7 - page 23, paragraph 4.3.2.2.3 * * page 24, paragraph 4.4 - page 27, paragraph 4.4.3.2.2 * * page 36, paragraph 4.4.3.4.2 - paragraph 4.4.4 * | Examination | WO2011091683 | WO2012077073 |