17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
25.08.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
16.09.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
14.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.09.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
11.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|