EP2957062 - TAMPER RESISTANT CRYPTOGRAPHIC ALGORITHM IMPLEMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irdeto B.V. 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIENER, Michael Irdeto Canada 2500 Solandt Road Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3G5 / CA | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/29] |
Former [2015/52] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13719033.6 | 27.03.2013 | [2015/52] | WO2013EP56615 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014154270 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957062 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2957062 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/06 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04L9/004 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (US);
G06F9/466 (US);
H04L9/0631 (EP,US);
H04L2209/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES MANIPULATIONSSICHEREN KRYPTOGRAFISCHEN ALGORITHMUS | [2015/52] | English: | TAMPER RESISTANT CRYPTOGRAPHIC ALGORITHM IMPLEMENTATION | [2015/52] | French: | MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN ALGORITHME CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE RÉSISTANT AU TRIPATOUILLAGE | [2020/33] |
Former [2015/52] | MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN ALGORITHME CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE INFALSIFIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 25.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2020 | 08.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2013 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | GB | 27.03.2022 | IE | 27.03.2022 | LU | 27.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - BAR-EL H ET AL, "The Sorcerer's Apprentice Guide to Fault Attacks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20060201), vol. 94, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2005.862424, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 370 - 382, XP011442695 [X] 1-5,8,10-13,16,18-21 * sections III.E. and V;; figures 10-19 * [I] 6,7,14,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2005.862424 | [A] - UNKNOWN ET AL, "Countermeasures against fault attacks on software implemented AES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH WORKSHOP ON EMBEDDED SYSTEMS SECURITY, WESS '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1145/1873548.1873555, ISBN 978-1-45-030078-0, pages 1 - 10, XP055096199 [A] 1-21 * page 1 - page 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1873548.1873555 | [A] - KARPOVSKY M ET AL, "Robust protection against fault-injection attacks on smart cards implementing the advanced encryption standard", DEPENDABLE SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS, 2004 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FLORENCE, ITALY 28 JUNE - 1 JULY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040628), doi:10.1109/DSN.2004.1311880, ISBN 978-0-7695-2052-0, pages 82 - 90, XP010710793 [A] 1-21 * section 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DSN.2004.1311880 | [A] - Marc Joye, "On White-Box Cryptography", Security of Information and Networks, (20080101), pages 7 - 12, URL: http://joye.site88.net/papers/Joy08whitebox.pdf, (20140114), XP055096418 [A] 1-21 * page 7 - page 11 * | Examination | - Anonymous, "N-version programming - Wikipedia", (20130215), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=N-version_programming&oldid=538408306, (20191024), XP055635706 | - Anonymous, "Triple modular redundancy - Wikipedia", (20120924), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Triple_modular_redundancy&oldid=514315723, (20200618), XP055706297 |