EP2845173 - TICKET VALIDATION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itso Limited Luminar House Deltic Avenue Milton Keynes, Buckinghamshire MK13 8LW / GB | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANFORD, Christopher John 19 Roundwood Lane Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 3BW / GB | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/15] |
Former [2015/11] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13719153.2 | 25.04.2013 | [2024/15] | WO2013GB51051 | Priority number, date | GB20120007692 | 02.05.2012 Original published format: GB 201207692 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013164579 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845173 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2845173 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/02, G07B15/04, G07C9/00, G06K19/077 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G07B15/02 (EP,GB);
G06K19/07771 (EP);
G07B15/04 (EP,GB);
G07C9/00309 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TICKETVALIDIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2015/11] | English: | TICKET VALIDATION APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2015/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE VALIDATION DE TICKET | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 09.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2018 | 30.04.2022 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2022 | 30.04.2023 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002070862 (FRANCIS ROBERT C [US], et al); | [X]WO2006016323 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [X]JP2006309630 (KAMIYAMA KYOKO); | [X]WO2008009654 (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al); | [I]US2008297310 (ONDERKO JOHN C [US]); | [A]US2010308957 (FINKENZELLER KLAUS [DE]) | Examination | US2006170533 | US2012096249 |