Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2845074 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454607 | 24.04.2012 | WO2013US37722 | 23.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013163135 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454607 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9507399 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2013278081 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454607 | 24.04.2012 |