EP2847269 - COMPOSITION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HYDROPHILIC POLYSTYRENE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BV) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLDITZ, Pirko Fetrasweg 16 22145 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
LIEBEHENTSCHEL, Lutz Am Gerstenfeld 20 22941 Bargteheide / DE | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/23] |
Former [2015/12] | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13719387.6 | 17.04.2013 | [2016/23] | WO2013EP01138 | Priority number, date | EP20120003707 | 09.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12003707 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013167229 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847269 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847269 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/06, C08L71/02, B65D81/26, C08J3/22, C08K3/26, C08K3/34, C08L51/04 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08L25/04 (KR);
B65D81/26 (KR);
C08J3/22 (KR,US);
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08J9/0023 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
C08J2425/06 (EP,US);
C08J2471/02 (EP,US);
C08K2003/265 (EP,US);
C08L2203/14 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L25/06, C08K2003/265, C08K3/346, C08L51/04, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
C08L25/06, C08K2003/265, C08K3/346, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L25/06, C08K3/26, C08K3/346, C08K5/103, C08L51/04, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
C08L25/06, C08K3/26, C08K3/346, C08K5/103, C08L71/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROPHILEM POLYSTYROLMATERIAL | [2015/12] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HYDROPHILIC POLYSTYRENE MATERIAL | [2015/12] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU DE POLYSTYRÈNE HYDROPHILE | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/12] | COMPOSITION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU POLYSTYRÈNE HYDROPHILE | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/48] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP2289994 (SAMJIN POLYTECH CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | EP2289994 |