EP2838660 - AUTOMATED DISPENSING APPARATUS WITH WASTE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/09] | METERING APPARATUS, IN PARTICULAR PIPETTING MACHINE HAVING A DISPOSAL CONTAINER | ||
[2019/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch 8 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEETZ, Torsten Sägenstr. 113 CH-7000 Chur / CH | 02 /
STÄDLER, Andreas Bergstr. 6 CH-7012 Felsberg / CH | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/09] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13719439.5 | 14.04.2013 | [2020/12] | WO2013EP57749 | Priority number, date | DE201210206239 | 17.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012206239 | [2015/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013156418 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2838660 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838660 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01L9/00, G01N35/10 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G01N35/1074 (EP,US);
B01L9/543 (EP,US);
G01N2035/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPETTIERAUTOMAT MIT ENTSORGUNGSBEHÄLTER | [2019/44] | English: | AUTOMATED DISPENSING APPARATUS WITH WASTE CONTAINER | [2019/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE AUTOMATIQUE AVEC RÉCIPIENT DE DÉCHETS | [2019/44] |
Former [2015/09] | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE PIPETTIERAUTOMAT MIT ENTSORGUNGSBEHÄLTER | ||
Former [2015/09] | METERING APPARATUS, IN PARTICULAR PIPETTING MACHINE HAVING A DISPOSAL CONTAINER | ||
Former [2015/09] | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE, ET PLUS PARTICULIÈREMENT AUTOMATE DE PIPETAGE COMPRENANT UN RÉCIPIENT D'ÉLIMINATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 21.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2013 | AL | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | AT | 14.04.2020 | IE | 14.04.2020 | LU | 14.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | FR | 18.05.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | GB | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 14.04.2013 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.04.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 18.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.04.2013 | |
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.04.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 18.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.04.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 18.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.04.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 18.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 18.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.04.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.04.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0114686 (CETUS CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11287810 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 18,19* the whole document *; | [A]US2001005489 (ROACH DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US6358470 (HIGUCHI AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1-17 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004108330 (ITOH TERUAKI [JP]) [A] 18,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005150314 (STAPLES KARY J [US], et al) [A] 18,19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1832880 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [X] 18,19 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2007269343 (HIGUCHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011059012 (MEDICA TEKKU KK) [A] 18,19 * the whole document * |