EP2838615 - PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STELLA, Qing One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
GUSKEY, Gerald, John One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
GARZA, Cynthia, Ann One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio45202 / US | 04 /
COFFINDAFFER, Timothy, Woodrow One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 05 /
CARTER, John, David One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 06 /
KYTE, Kenneth, Eugene, III One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 13719677.0 | 18.04.2013 | WO2013US37164 | Priority number, date | US201261635884P | 20.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261635884 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013158877 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838615 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q9/02, A61Q19/00, A61K8/92 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (US);
A61Q9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Title | German: | KÖRPERREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2015/09] | English: | PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS | [2015/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'HYGIÈNE PERSONNELLE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 09.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1479365 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [ID]US2009220443 (BRAKSMAYER DIZA PEARL [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2010092102 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 2; example -; claim - *; | [A]US2012010303 (MUJKIC MONIKA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [D]WO2012006324 (ELEVANCE RENEWABLE SCIENCES [US], et al); | [X] - MICHAEL STARCH, "New Cosmetic Ingredients Based on Soybean Oil", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20070615), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013120951 [X] 1-15 * pages 6, 12 * * page 14 * | [A] - MICHAEL STARCH ET AL, "New Cosmetic Ingredients Based on Metathesized Soybean Oil", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20100909), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013140234 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2438091 | US2528378 | US2658072 | US5011681 | US5104646 | US5106609 | US2007128255 | US2007288186 | US2009220443 | US2012009285 | WO2012006324 | WO2012009525 | - C. D. VAUGHAN, "Effects in Product, Package, Penetration and Preservation", COSMETICS AND TOILETRIES, (198810), vol. 103, XP000872394 | US20090510880 | US20090511034 |