Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2838615
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.06.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
06.06.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.10.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
14.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
13.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
30.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.12.2016 |
First examination report |
|
19.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
17.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
10.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
23.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|