Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013281551 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313865588 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013280356 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | US201313865554 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2838616 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104245050 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104245049 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2870462 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2016 | C | CA2870462 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2869900 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | C | CA2869900 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2838615 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014026117 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014026118 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN8523DELNP2014 | 15.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN8524DELNP2014 | 15.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2014011526 | 16.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2014011550 | 14.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014502334 | 22.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US37164 | 18.04.2013 | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014502335 | 22.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | WO2013US37165 | 18.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013158878 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013158877 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261635884 | 20.04.2012 |