|
30.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Rectification of designation of inventor (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
31.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
31.10.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
38 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |