01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
01.11.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
18.01.2019 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Request filed for correction of the decision to grant |
|
23.11.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
20.11.2018 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
20.11.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.11.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.11.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.11.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.11.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.11.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.06.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
07.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
08.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
26.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
08.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
11.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|