Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9558861 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | B2 | US2015060737 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 | WO2013FR50734 | 03.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140147882 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 | WO2013FR50734 | 03.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6328609B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B2 | JP2015517010 | 18.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 | WO2013FR50734 | 03.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104428367 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 | WO2013FR50734 | 03.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2834305 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | B1 | EP2834305 | 11.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 | WO2013FR50734 | 03.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013150242 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2989091 | 03.07.2015 | B1 | FR2989091 | 11.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1253228 | 06.04.2012 |