EP2841104 - PROSTAGLANDIN AND VASOCONSTRICTOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIFFMAN, Rhett M. 1843 Temple Hills Drive Laguna Beach, California 92651 / US | 02 /
CHEN, June 28771 Via Los Arboles San Juan Capistrano, California 92675 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13720200.8 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013US37848 | Priority number, date | US201261637597P | 24.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261637597 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163219 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841104 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/138, A61K31/34, A61K31/4045, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4704, A61K31/498, A61K31/5377, A61K31/5575, A61P27/06 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/5575 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/222 (EP,US);
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4704 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/5355 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/34, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4704, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/498, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE PROSTAGLANDIN- UND VASOKONSTRIKTORZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2015/10] | English: | PROSTAGLANDIN AND VASOCONSTRICTOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2015/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DE PROSTAGLANDINE ET DE VASOCONSTRICTEUR, ET MÉTHODES LES UTILISANT | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 10.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/44] | 27.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2017 | 28.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012015998 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,17-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2011087790 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,17-20 * claim -; table - *; | [XP]WO2013013143 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,7-10,17,18 * page 3, line 12 - line 16; claim -; table - * | [X] - MARTINEZ ANTONIO ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of bimatoprost/timolol fixed combination in the treatment of glaucoma or ocular hypertension", 20080101, (200801), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 137 - 143, XP009146376 [X] 1-5,7-10,17-20 * abstract * * page 138, column 2, paragraph 6 * | Examination | - NETLAND PETER A ET AL, "Brimonidine Purite and bimatoprost compared with timolol and latanoprost in patients with glaucoma and ocular hypertension", ADVANCES IN THERAPY, HEALTH COMMUNICATIONS, METUCHEN, NJ, US, (20030101), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF02850116, ISSN 0741-238X, pages 20 - 30, XP009146371 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02850116 | by applicant | - ABELSON MB ET AL., ADV. THER., (2003), vol. 20, pages 1 - 13 | - LEAL BC ET AL., AM J OPHTHALMOL, (2004), vol. 138, pages 310 - 313 | - CHEN J ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2004), vol. 45, page 2609 | - Pharmacology Review of New Drug Application 21-275, FDA/CENTER FOR DRUG EVALUATION AND RESEARCH, (2001), pages 1 - 107 | - CHEN J ET AL., OPTOMETRY PRACT, (2002), vol. 3, pages 95 - 102 | - COHEN JS ET AL., SURV OPHTHALMOL, (2004), vol. 49, pages S45 - S52 | - CHRISTIANSEN GA ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2004), vol. 111, pages 1658 - 1662 | - DUBINER H ET AL., SURV OPHTHALMOL, (2001), vol. 45, no. 4, pages S353 - S360 | - EISENBERG DL; TORIS CB; CAMRAS CB, SURV OPHTHALMOL, (2002), vol. 47, pages S105 - S115 | - GANDOLFI SA; CIMINO L, OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2003), vol. 110, pages 609 - 614 | - HIGGINBOTHAM EJ; SCHUMAN JS; GOLDBERG I ET AL., ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2002), vol. 120, pages 1286 - 1293 | - NOECKER RS ET AL., AM J OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 135, pages 55 - 63 | - PARRISH RK; PALMBERG P; SHEU W-P, AM J OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 135, pages 688 - 703 | - WILLIAMS RD., ADV THER, (2002), vol. 19, pages 275 - 281 | - WOODWARD DF; PHELPS RL; KRAUSS AH-P ET AL., CARDIOVASC DRUG REV, (2004), vol. 22, pages 103 - 120 | - ABELSON MB ET AL., ADV THER, (2003), vol. 20, pages 1 - 13 | - EISENBERG D; TORIS CB; CAMRAS CB, SURV OPHTHALMOL, (2002), vol. 47, pages S105 - S115 | - STEWART WC ET AL., AM J OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 135, pages 314 - 320 | - CHEN J ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (2005), vol. 144, pages 493 - 501 | - SPADA CS; KRAUSS AH-P; WOODWARD DF ET AL., EXP EYE RES, (2005), vol. 80, pages 135 - 145 | - WOODWARD DF; KRAUSS AH-P; CHEN J ET AL., SURV. OPHTHALMOL, (2001), vol. 45, pages S337 - S345 | - WOODWARD DF; KRAUSS AH-P; CHEN J ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (2003), vol. 305, pages 772 - 785 | - ASTIN M; STJERNSCHANTZ J; SELEN G, EXP EYE RES, (1994), vol. 59, pages 401 - 408 | - ASTIN M; STJERNSCHANTZ J, EUR J PHARMACOL, (1997), vol. 340, pages 195 - 201 | - ASTIN M; STJERNSCHANTZ J, CURR EYE RES, (1997), vol. 16, pages 886 - 890 | - ASTIN M., J OCUL PHARMACOL, (1998), vol. 14, pages 119 - 128 | - CHEN J. ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 116, pages 3035 - 3041 | - CHCN J; WOODWARD DF, ADV EXP MED BIOL, (2002), vol. 507, pages 331 - 336 | - STEWART WC ET AL., AM.1 OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 135, pages 314 - 320 | - FURCHGOTT RF; ZAWADZKI JV, NATURE, (1980), vol. 288, pages 373 - 376 | - ALBRECHT EW ET AL., J PATHOL, (2003), vol. 1999, pages 8 - 17 | - KOSS MC, EUR J PHARMACOL, (1999), vol. 374, pages 161 - 174 | - SCHMETTERER L; POLAK K, PROG RETIN EYE RES., (2001), vol. 20, pages 823 - 847 | - KIM JC ET AL., J KOREAN MED SCI, (2002), vol. 17, pages 389 - 394 | - ALBRECHT EW ET AL., JPATHOL, (2003), vol. 1999, pages 8 - 17 | - CIRINO G; FIORUCCI S; SESSA WC, TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (2003), vol. 24, pages 91 - 95 | - HIGGINBOTHAM EJ; SCHUMAN JS; GOLDBCRG I, ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2002), vol. 120, pages 1286 - 1293 | - GUENOUN J-M ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2005), vol. 46, pages 2444 - 2450 | - LEAL BC ET AL., AM JOPHTHALMOL, (2004), vol. 138, pages 310 - 313 | - MROZ M; ABELSON MB ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2003), vol. 44, page 4417 | - ABELSON MB ET AL., ADV THET, (2003), vol. 20, pages 1 - 13 | - ASTIN M; STJEMSCHANTZ J, EUR JPHARMACOL, (1997), vol. 340, pages 195 - 201 | - ASTIN M; STJEMSCHANTZ J; SELEN G, EXP EYE RES, (1994), vol. 59, pages 401 - 408 | - CHEN J; WOODWARD DF, 4DV EXP MED BIOL, (2002), vol. 507, pages 331 - 336 | - CHEN J. ET AL., BR JPHARMACOL, (1995), vol. 116, pages 3035 - 3041 | - CHCN J, Current protocols in pharmacology, JOHN WILCY & SONS, INC., (2001), pages 4.18.1 - 4.18.41 | - FERREIRA SH; HERMAN AG; VANE JR, BRJPHARMACOL, (1976), vol. 56, pages 469 - 477 | - HAYE-LEGRAND I; CERRINA J; RAFFESTIN B ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1986), vol. 239, pages 536 - 541 | - BOTTING JH; SALZMANN R, BR J PHARMACOL, (1974), vol. 50, pages 119 - 124 | - ALSTER P; WENNMALM A, EUR .1 PHARMACOL, (1983), vol. 86, pages 441 - 446 | - CHEN J ET AL., Current protocols in pharmacology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (2001), pages 4.18.1 - 4.18.41 | - ABOULAFIA J ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (1976), vol. 58, pages 223 - 228 | - GOODFRIEND TL; SIMPSON RU, BR J PHARMACOL, (1981), vol. 72, pages 247 - 255 | - NORTHOVER BJ, BR JPHARMACOL, (1971), vol. 41, pages 540 - 551 | - SAWDY R ET AL., BRJPHARMACOL, (1998), vol. 125, pages 1212 - 1217 | - REES DD ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 101, pages 746 - 752 | - ASTIN M; STJERNSCHANTZ J; SELÉN G., EXP EYE RES, (1994), vol. 59, pages 401 - 408 | - STJEMSCHANTZ J ET AL., PROG RETIN EYE RES, (2000), vol. 19, pages 459 - 496 | - ASTIN M; STJEMSCHANTZ J, EURJPHARMACOL, (1997), vol. 340, pages 195 - 201 | - MROZ M; ABELSON MB, INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2003), vol. 44, page 4417 | - NOECKER RS ET AL., AM.1 OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 135, pages 55 - 63 |