EP2839378 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING CACHE COHERENCE IN A NETWORK OF PROCESSORS PROVIDED WITH CACHE MEMORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Bull S.A.S. Rue Jean Jaurès BP 68 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Bull S.A.S. Rue Jean Jaurès B.P. 68 78340 Les Clayes sous Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARD, Christian 120 chemin de l'Arny F-38960 Saint Etienne de Crossey / FR | 02 /
GUTHMULLER, Eric 29 Vie Etroite F-38300 Ruy / FR | 03 /
NGUYEN, Huy Nam 33 Avenue de la Liberté F-94260 Fresnes / FR | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/09] | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, Rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13720479.8 | 12.04.2013 | [2017/40] | WO2013FR50802 | Priority number, date | FR20120053498 | 16.04.2012 Original published format: FR 1253498 | [2015/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013156716 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839378 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839378 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/0813, G06F12/0817 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
G06F12/0817 (EP,US);
G06F12/0828 (US);
G06F12/0813 (US);
G06F2212/254 (EP,US);
G06F2212/621 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | G06F12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON CACHE-KOHÄRENZ IN EINEM NETZWERK AUS MIT CACHE-SPEICHERN AUSGERÜSTETEN PROZESSOREN | [2015/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING CACHE COHERENCE IN A NETWORK OF PROCESSORS PROVIDED WITH CACHE MEMORIES | [2015/09] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UNE COHERENCE DE CACHES DANS UN RESEAU DE PROCESSEURS MUNIS DE MEMOIRES CACHES | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 23.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2013 | AL | 04.10.2017 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | IE | 12.04.2018 | LU | 12.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.04.2013 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.04.2018 | ||
LU | 12.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 12.04.2013 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.04.2018 | ||
LU | 12.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.04.2018 | ||
LU | 12.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.04.2018 | ||
LU | 12.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 12.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 12.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0911736 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 17] , [0 74] , [ 106] - [0118] - [ 217] - [0219]; figures 2, 6,8,9, 12a *; | [A]US2003191906 (CHEN WEI-LONG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0027] , [0 28]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2010049922 (ARONOVICH LIOR [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0035] - [0066] - [0071] - [0 76] - [0090] - [ 104] , [0116] - [0127] - [ 138]; figures 9, 12; claims 1-5,9, 10, 12 *; | [A] - NOEL EISLEY ET AL, "In-Network Cache Coherence", MICROARCHITECTURE, 2006. MICRO-39. 39TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20061201), ISBN 978-0-7695-2732-1, pages 321 - 332, XP031034181 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - THAPAR M ET AL, "Linked list cache coherence for scalable shared memory multiprocessors", PARALLEL PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM, 1993., PROCEEDINGS OF SEVENTH INTERNATI ONAL NEWPORT, CA, USA 13-16 APRIL 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19930413), doi:10.1109/IPPS.1993.262852, ISBN 978-0-8186-3442-0, pages 34 - 43, XP010031918 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPPS.1993.262852 | [A] - YUANG ZHANG ET AL, "Towards hierarchical cluster based cache coherence for large-scale network-on-chip", DESIGN&TECHNOLOGY OF INTEGRATED SYSTEMS IN NANOSCAL ERA, 2009. DTIS '09. 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090406), doi:10.1109/DTIS.2009.4938037, ISBN 978-1-4244-4320-8, pages 119 - 122, XP031456362 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DTIS.2009.4938037 | [A] - Andreas Lankes, Thomas Wild, Andreas Herkersdorf, "Comparison of Deadlock Recovery and Avoidance Mechanisms to Approach Message Dependent Deadlocks in on-chip Networks", 2010 ACM/IEEE International Symposium on Networks-on-Chip (NOCS), doi:10.1109/NOCS.2010.11, ISBN 978-0-7695-4053-5, (20100712), Technishe Universitaet Muenchen, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=5507567, (20130201), XP002691715 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOCS.2010.11 | by applicant | - THAPAR ET AL., "Linked list cache coherence for scalable shared memory multiprocessors", PROCEEDINGS OF 7TH INTERNATIONAL PARALLEL PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM, (19930413), doi:doi:10.1109/IPPS.1993.262852, pages 34 - 43, XP010031918 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPPS.1993.262852 | - YUANG ET AL., "Towards hierarchical cluster based cache coherence for large-scale network-on-chip", PROCEEDING OF 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFéRENCE ON DESIGN & TECHNOLOGY OF INTEGRATED SYSTEMS IN NANOSCAL ERA, (20090406), doi:doi:10.1109/DTIS.2009.4938037, pages 119 - 122, XP031456362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DTIS.2009.4938037 | - EISLEY ET AL., "In-network cache coherence", PROCEEDING OF 39TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE, (20061209), doi:doi:10.1109/MICRO.2006.27, pages 321 - 332, XP058106989 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.2006.27 | - LANKES ET AL., "Comparison of deadlock recovery and avoidance mechanisms to approach message dépendent deadlocks in on-chip networks", PROCEEDING OF 4TH IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON NETWORKS-ON-CHIP, (20100503), pages 17 - 24, XP031707271 |