EP2822992 - AN ESSENTIALLY BIOBASED, THERMOFORMABLE COMPOSITION AND CONTAINERS FORMED THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huhtamäki Oyj Miestentie 9 02150 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Purac Biochem bv Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOEKSTRA, Aad Coehoornsingel 82 NL-7201 AE Zutphen / NL | 02 /
SCHENNINK, GeraldG. J. Keppelseweg 32A NL-7031 EB Wehl / NL | 03 /
DE VOS, Sicco De Spade 12 NL-6846 JL Arnhem / NL | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger, Helga, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Kutzenberger, Helga, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13720772.6 | 07.03.2013 | [2015/49] | WO2013EP00665 | Priority number, date | EP20120001550 | 07.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12001550 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013131649 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822992 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822992 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/34, C08L67/04, B65D81/38 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,RU,US);
B29C51/002 (US);
B29D22/003 (US);
B65D1/265 (EP,RU,US);
B65D65/466 (EP,RU,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
B29K2067/046 (EP,US);
B29K2509/00 (EP,US);
B29L2022/00 (EP,US);
C08L2201/06 (US);
C08L2203/30 (US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
C08L2205/24 (US);
Y02A40/90 (EP,US);
Y02W90/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08K3/34, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEITGEHEND BIOBASIERTE, WARMFORMBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BEHÄLTER DARAUS | [2015/03] | English: | AN ESSENTIALLY BIOBASED, THERMOFORMABLE COMPOSITION AND CONTAINERS FORMED THEREOF | [2015/03] | French: | COMPOSITION ESSENTIELLEMENT D'ORIGINE BIOLOGIQUE, THERMOFORMABLE ET CONTENEURS FORMÉS DE CELLE-CI | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 03.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2013 | AL | 02.12.2015 | AT | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | RS | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IE | 07.03.2016 | LU | 07.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 02.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2005281331 ; | [A]US2007032631 (OUCHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * examples 1-7; table 1 * * comparative examples 7 & 8 * * paragraph [0105] *; | [A]US2009035585 (WAKAKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0117] ** comparative examples 22 & 23;;; table 7 *; | [I]US2009186178 (ITO TAKUROU [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0071] * * examples 1,2,4,9,10; table 1 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 76, Database accession no. 2005-737816, XP002680613 & JP2005281331 A 20051013 (TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-4,6-11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * examples 1-5; table 1 * [I] 1-14 |