EP2828250 - QUINAZOLINE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE IN THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial College Innovations Limited Level 1 Faculty Building c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | For all designated states Emory University 1599 Clifton Rd. NE 4th Floor Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [2019/50] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Imperial Innovations Limited 52 Princes Gate Exhibition Road London SW7 2PG / GB | ||
For all designated states Emory University 1599 Clifton Rd. NE 4th Floor Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Robert c/o Imperial College London Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | 02 /
FUCHTER, Matthew John c/o Imperial College London Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | 03 /
CHAPMAN-ROTHE, Nadine c/o Imperial College London Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | 04 /
SRIMONGKOLPITHAK, Nitipol Flat 4 71 Queen's Gate London SW7 5JT / GB | 05 /
CARON, Joachim 74 Comeragh Road London W14 9HR / GB | 06 /
SNYDER, James P 1085 Rosedale Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US | 07 /
GANESH, Thota 3360 Archgate Court Alpharetta Atlanta, Georgia 30004 / US | 08 /
LIU, Jin 831 Highland Lake Circle Decatur Atlanta, Georgia 30033 / US | 09 /
SUN, Aiming 1624 Johnson Road Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US | [2021/10] |
Former [2015/05] | 01 /
BROWN, Robert c/o Imperial College London Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | ||
02 /
FUCHTER, Matthew John c/o Imperial College London Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
03 /
CHAPMAN-ROTHE, Nadine c/o Imperial College London Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
04 /
SRIMONGKOLPITHAK, Nitipol Flat 4 71 Queen's Gate London SW7 5JT / GB | |||
05 /
CARON, Joachim 74 Comeragh Road London W14 9HR / GB | |||
06 /
SYNDER, James 1085 Rosedale Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US | |||
07 /
GANESH, Thota 3360 Archgate Court Alpharetta Atlanta, Georgia 30004 / US | |||
08 /
LIU, Jin 831 Highland Lake Circle Decatur Atlanta, Georgia 30033 / US | |||
09 /
SUN, Aiming 1624 Johnson Road Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
Former [2015/05] | Brady, Paul Andrew, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13721004.3 | 19.03.2013 | [2021/10] | WO2013GB50689 | Priority number, date | US201261612694P | 19.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261612694 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140148 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828250 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2828250 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D401/12, C07D239/95, C07D491/056, A61K31/517, A61P35/00, A61P31/18, A61P25/28 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
C07D239/95 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINAZOLIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2020/31] | English: | QUINAZOLINE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE IN THERAPY | [2015/05] | French: | COMPOSES DE QUINAZOLINE ET LEUR APPLICATION THERAPEUTQUE | [2020/31] |
Former [2015/05] | CHINAZOLINVERBINDUNGEN UND DEREN THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2015/05] | COMPOSÉS DE QUINAZOLINE ET LEUR UTILISATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2013 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | IE | 19.03.2021 | LU | 19.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.03.2013 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.03.2013 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 19.03.2013 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6156758 (KUNG PEI-PEI [US], et al) [X] 4-6,17,18,21-24,27 * column 5, fourth compound; table 1, compound no. 16; * * abstract * * column 9, lines 52-64 * [Y] 1-27; | [X]WO2009143058 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10-13 * page 18, third row, first formula; page 28, compound 52; page 39, compound 86; page 40, compound 88; page 105, compound 217; page 106, compound 218; page 116, compound 52; page 119, compounds 86 and 88; page 132, compounds 217 and 218 *; | [X]JP2000281660 ; | [X]WO2005123697 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 28, example 6 *; | [X]WO2005082865 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 4-6 * page 64, example 4; page 67, example 41; page 69, examples 69 and 72, page 73, examples 100 and 101 *; | [X]WO2005046698 (SYNTA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 4 * example 9 *; | [AD]WO2012005805 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-27 * claims 1,6-8 *; | [AD]WO2011140324 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-27 * claims 1,11-13 * | [XY] - FENG LIU ET AL., "Protein Lysine Methyltransferase G9a Inhibitors: Design, Synthesis, and Structure Activity Relationships of 2,4-Diamino-7-aminoalkoxy-quinazolines", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 53, no. 15, doi:10.1021/jm100478y, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 5844 - 5857, XP002702498 [X] 1-6,11,12,18,20,27 * page 5844, abstract; page 5845, figure 1; page 5846, table 1, compounds 3a, 3l to 3n * [Y] 1-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm100478y | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 10, Database accession no. 2001-084121, XP002702499 & JP2000281660 A 20001010 (SUMITOMO SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0043], chemical formula 19 and table, entries 1 and 4; paragraph [0047], chemical formula 23 and table, entry 1 * | [YD] - FENG LIU ET AL., "Optimization of Cellular Activity of G9a Inhibitors 7-Aminoalkoxy-quinazolines", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 54, no. 17, doi:10.1021/jm200903z, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 6139 - 6150, XP002702500 [YD] 1-27 * page 6139, abstract; page 6140, figure 1, compounds (1) and (5); figure 2; page 6141, table 1; scheme 1, compound 17; page 6142, table 2; page 6143, scheme 2; page 6144, tables 3 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200903z | [Y] - FENG JIU ET AL., "Discovery of a 2,4-Diamino-7-aminoalkoxyquinazoline as a Potent and Selective Inhibitor of Histone Lysine Methyltransferase G9a", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 52, no. 24, doi:10.1021/jm901543m, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 7950 - 7953, XP002702501 [Y] 1-27 * page 7950, figure 1; page 7951, tables 1, 2; page 7952, scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm901543m | [Y] - CHANG Y ET AL, "Adding a Lysine Mimic in the Design of Potent Inhibitors of Histone Lysine Methyltransferases", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 400, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2010.04.048, ISSN 0022-2836, (20100702), pages 1 - 7, (20100609), XP027084528 [Y] 1-27 * page 1, abstract; page 2, figure 1 (a) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2010.04.048 | [Y] - STEFAN KUBICEK ET AL, "Reversal of H3K9me2 by a small-molecule inhibitor for the G9a histone methyltransferase", MOLECULAR CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.MOLCEL.2007.01.017, ISSN 1097-2765, (20070209), pages 473 - 481, (20070208), XP002635011 [Y] 1-27 * page 474, compound BIX-01294 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.MOLCEL.2007.01.017 | Examination | WO2009001060 | - C Zagni ET AL, "Histone Methyltransferase Inhibitors: Novel Epigenetic Agents for Cancer Treatment", Current Medicinal Chemistry, (20130101), pages 167 - 185, URL: http://docserver.ingentaconnect.com/deliver/connect/ben/09298673/v20n2/s2.pdf?expires=1487240098&id=89934347&titleid=3863&accname=European+Patent+Office&checksum=2166C033E1950F855D71EF569B566CE1, (20170216), XP055346532 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/092986713804806667 | - Daniel Decarlo ET AL, "Oncoepigenomics: Making histone lysine methylation count", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., FR, (20120811), vol. 56, doi:10.1016/j.ejmech.2012.08.010, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 179 - 194, XP055346543 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2012.08.010 | - Philip Jones, "Development of second generation epigenetic agents", MedChemComm, United Kingdom, (20120101), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1039/C1MD00199J, ISSN 2040-2503, pages 135 - 161, XP055285501 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C1MD00199J | - Munikumar R. Doddareddy ET AL, "Prospective Validation of a Comprehensive In silico hERG Model and its Applications to Commercial Compound and Drug Databases", ChemMedChem, DE, (20100427), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1002/cmdc.201000024, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 716 - 729, XP055486904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201000024 | - HORI ET AL, "Novel 4-Phenoxy-2- (1-piperazinyl)quinazolines as Potent Anticonvulsive and Antihypoxic Agents", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JP, (19900301), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 681 - 687, XP002093298 | - KAZUHIRO YOKOYAMA ET AL, "Discovery of potent CCR4 antagonists: Synthesis and structure-activity relationship study of 2,4-diaminoquinazolines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 16, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2008.05.036, ISSN 0968-0896, (20080715), pages 7021 - 7032, (20080520), XP002546278 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BMC.2008.05.036 | - YOKOYAMA K ET AL, "Potent and orally bioavailable CCR4 antagonists: Synthesis and structure-activity relationship study of 2-aminoquinazolines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2008.11.020, ISSN 0968-0896, (20090101), pages 64 - 73, (20081117), XP025875977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2008.11.020 | by applicant | WO2011140324 | WO2012005805 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2011), vol. 54, no. 17, pages 6139 - 6150 | - S. BYRN ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 954 - 954 | - R. LIU, Water-Insoluble Drug Formulation, CRC PRESS, page 553 | - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, Prodrugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A. C. S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (1976), vol. 14 | - SHARMA S; KELLY TK; JONES PA, "Epigenetics in cancer", CARCINOGENESIS, (2010), vol. 31, pages 27 - 36 | - JONES PA; BAYLIN SB, "The fundamental role of epigenetic events in cancer.", NAT REV GENET, (2002), vol. 3, pages 415 - 28, XP008042555 | - KONDO Y; SHEN L; CHENG AS; AHMED S; BOUMBER Y; CHARO C ET AL., "Gene silencing in cancer by histone H3 lysine 27 trimethylation independent of promoter DNA methylation", NAT GENET, (2008), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1038/ng.159, pages 741 - 50, XP002598429 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.159 | - CHAPMAN-ROTHE N; BROWN R, "Approaches to target the genome and its epigenome in cancer", FUTURE MED CHEM, (2009), vol. 1, pages 1481 - 95 | - CAO R; ZHANG Y, "The functions of E(Z)/EZH2-mediated methylation of lysine 27 in histone H3", CURR OPIN GENET DEV, (2004), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.gde.2004.02.001, pages 155 - 64, XP002364202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gde.2004.02.001 | - HANSEN KH; BRACKEN AP; PASINI D; DIETRICH N; GEHANI SS; MONRAD A ET AL., "A model for transmission of the H3K27me3 epigenetic mark", NAT CELL BIOL, (2008), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/ncb1787, pages 1291 - 300, XP055403596 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb1787 | - MARGUERON R; LI G; SARMA K; BLAIS A; ZAVADIL J; WOODCOCK CL ET AL., "Ezhl and Ezh2 maintain repressive chromatin through different mechanisms", MOL CELL, (2008), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2008.11.004, pages 503 - 18, XP055230106 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2008.11.004 | - SHEN X; LIU Y; HSU YJ; FUJIWARA Y; KIM J; MAO X ET AL., "EZH1 mediates methylation on histone H3 lysine 27 and complements EZH2 in maintaining stem cell identity and executing pluripotency", MOL CELL, (2008), vol. 32, pages 491 - 502 | - PIETERSEN AM; HORLINGS HM; HAUPTMANN M; LANGEROD A; AJOUAOU A; CORNELISSEN-STEIJGER P ET AL., "EZH2 and BMIl inversely correlate with prognosis and TP53 mutation in breast cancer", BREAST CANCER RES, (2008), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1186/bcr2214, page R109, XP021053436 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/bcr2214 | - YU J; YU J; RHODES DR; TOMLINS SA; CAO X; CHEN G ET AL., "A polycomb repression signature in metastatic prostate cancer predicts cancer outcome", CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 67, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2498, pages 10657 - 63, XP055070110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2498 | - RAO ZY; CAI MY; YANG GF; HE LR; MAI SJ; HUA WF ET AL., "EZH2 supports ovarian carcinoma cell invasion and/or metastasis via regulation of TGF-betal and is a predictor of outcome in ovarian carcinoma patients", CARCINOGENESIS, (2010), vol. 31, pages 1576 - 83 | - LU C; HAN HD; MANGALA LS; ALI-FEHMI R; NEWTON CS; OZBUN L ET AL., "Regulation of tumor angiogenesis by EZH2", CANCER CELL, (2010), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2010.06.016, pages 185 - 97, XP055467227 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2010.06.016 | - MIN J; ZASLAVSKY A; FEDELE G; MCLAUGHLIN SK; RECZEK EE; DE RT ET AL., "An oncogene-tumor suppressor cascade drives metastatic prostate cancer by coordinately activating Ras and nuclear factor-kappaB", NAT MED, (2010), vol. 16, pages 286 - 94 | - FUSSBROICH B; WAGENERN; MACHER-GOEPPINGER S; BENNER A; FALTH M; SULTMANN H ET AL., "EZH2 depletion blocks the proliferation of colon cancer cells", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page 21651 | - KAMMINGA LM; BYSTRYKH LV; DE BA; HOUWER S; DOUMA J; WEERSING E ET AL., "The Polycomb group gene Ezh2 prevents hematopoietic stem cell exhaustion", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 2170 - 9 | - RIZZO S; HERSEY JM; MELLOR P; DAI W; SANTOS-SILVA A; LIBER D ET AL., "Ovarian cancer stem cell-like side populations are enriched following chemotherapy and overexpress EZH2", MOL CANCER THER, (2011), vol. 10, pages 325 - 35 | - TAN J; YANG X; ZHUANG L; JIANG X; CHEN W; LEE PL ET AL., "Pharmacologic disruption of Polycomb-repressive complex 2-mediated gene repression selectively induces apoptosis in cancer cells", GENES DEV, (2007), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1101/GAD.1524107, pages 1050 - 63, XP002585917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GAD.1524107 | - MIRANDA TB; CORTEZ CC; YOO CB; LIANG G; ABE M; KELLY TK ET AL., "DZNep is a global histone methylation inhibitor that reactivates developmental genes not silenced by DNA methylation", MOL CANCER THER, (2009), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-09-0013, pages 1579 - 88, XP055049435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-09-0013 | - DAIGLE SR; OLHAVA EJ; THERKELSEN CA; MAJER CR; SNEERINGER CJ; SONG J ET AL., "Selective killing of mixed lineage leukemia cells by a potent small-molecule DOT1L inhibitor", CANCER CELL, (2011), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2011.06.009, pages 53 - 65, XP028379881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2011.06.009 | - YAO Y; CHEN P; DIAO J; CHENG G; DENG L; ANGLIN JL ET AL., "Selective inhibitors of histone methyltransferase DOT1L: design, synthesis, and crystallographic studies", J AM CHEM SOC, (2011), vol. 133, doi:doi:10.1021/ja206312b, pages 16746 - 9, XP055096708 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja206312b | - KUBICEK S; O'SULLIVAN RJ; AUGUST EM; HICKEY ER; ZHANG Q; TEODORO ML ET AL., "Reversal of H3K9me2 by a small-molecule inhibitor for the G9a histone methyltransferase", MOL CELL, (2007), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/J.MOLCEL.2007.01.017, pages 473 - 81, XP002635011 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.MOLCEL.2007.01.017 | - SHI Y; DO JT; DESPONTS C; HAHM HS; SCHOLER HR; DING S, "A combined chemical and genetic approach for the generation of induced pluripotent stem cells", CELL STEM CELL, (2008), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.stem.2008.05.011, pages 525 - 8, XP002564353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2008.05.011 | - SHI Y; DESPONTS C; DO JT; HAHM HS; SCHOLER HR; DING S, "Induction of pluripotent stem cells from mouse embryonic fibroblasts by Oct4 and Klf4 with small-molecule compounds", CELL STEM CELL, (2008), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.stem.2008.10.004, pages 568 - 74, XP007913847 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2008.10.004 | - IMAI K; TOGAMI H; OKAMOTO T, "Involvement of histone H3 lysine 9 (H3K9) methyltransferase G9a in the maintenance of HIV-1 latency and its reactivation by BIX01294", J BIOL CHEM, (2010), vol. 285, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.103531, pages 16538 - 45, XP002691444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.103531 | - LIU F; CHEN X; ALLALI-HASSANI A; QUINN AM; WASNEY GA; DONG A ET AL., "Discovery of a 2,4-diamino-7-aminoalkoxyquinazoline as a potent and selective inhibitor of histone lysine methyltransferase G9a", J MED CHEM, (2009), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1021/jm901543m, pages 7950 - 3, XP002702501 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm901543m | - LIU F; CHEN X; ALLALI-HASSANI A; QUINN AM; WIGLE TJ; WASNEY GA ET AL., "Protein lysine methyltransferase G9a inhibitors: design, synthesis, and structure activity relationships of2,4-diamino-7-aminoalkoxy-quinazolines", J MED CHEM, (2010), vol. 53, doi:doi:10.1021/jm100478y, pages 5844 - 57, XP002702498 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm100478y | - LIU F; BARSYTE-LOVEJOY D; ALLALI-HASSANI A; HE Y; HEROLD JM; CHEN X ET AL., "Optimization of cellular activity of G9a inhibitors 7-aminoalkoxy-quinazolines", J MED CHEM, (2011), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1021/jm200903z, pages 6139 - 50, XP002702500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200903z | - VEDADI M; BARSYTE-LOVEJOY D; LIU F; RIVAL-GERVIER S; ALLALI-HASSANI A; LABRIE V ET AL., "A chemical probe selectively inhibits G9a and GLP methyltransferase activity in cells", NAT CHEM BIOL, (2011), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nchembio.599, pages 566 - 74, XP002667515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.599 | - CHANG Y; ZHANG X; HORTON JR; UPADHYAY AK; SPANNHOFF A; LIU J ET AL., "Structural basis for G9a-like protein lysine methyltransferase inhibition by BIX-01294", NAT STRUCT MOL BIO, (2009), vol. 16, pages 312 - 7 | - WU H; CHEN X; XIONG J; LI Y; LI H; DING X ET AL., "Histone methyltransferase G9a contributes to H3K27 methylation in vivo", CELL RES, (2011), vol. 21, pages 365 - 7 | - PASINI D; BRACKEN AP; JENSEN MR; LAZZERINI DE; HELIN K, "Suzl2 is essential for mouse development and for EZH2 histone methyltransferase activity", EMBO J, (2004), vol. 23, pages 4061 - 71 | - SARMA K; MARGUERON R; IVANOV A; PIRROTTA V; REINBERG D, "Ezh2 requires PHF1 to efficiently catalyze H3 lysine 27 trimethylation in vivo", MOL CELL BIO, (2008), vol. 28, pages 2718 - 31 | - WANG Z; ZANG C; ROSENFELD JA; SCHONES DE; BARSKI A; CUDDAPAH S ET AL., "Combinatorial patterns of histone acetylations and methylations in the human genome", NAT GENET, (2008), vol. 40, pages 897 - 903 | - BANNISTER AJ; KOUZARIDES T, "Regulation of chromatin by histone modifications", CELL RES, (2011), vol. 21, pages 381 - 95 | - RINGROSE L; PARO R, "Epigenetic regulation of cellular memory by the Polycomb and Trithorax group proteins", ANNU REV GENET, (2004), vol. 38, pages 413 - 43 | - BARRADAS M; ANDERTON E; ACOSTA JC; LI S; BANITO A; RODRIGUEZ-NIEDENFUHR M ET AL., "Histone demethylase JMJD3 contributes to epigenetic control of INK4a/ARF by oncogenic RAS", GENES DEV, (2009), vol. 23, pages 1177 - 82 | - CHANG Y; GANESH T; HORTON JR; SPANNHOFF A; LIU J; SUN A ET AL., "Adding a lysine mimic in the design of potent inhibitors of histone lysine methyltransferases", J MOL BIOL, (2010), vol. 400, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2010.04.048, pages 1 - 7, XP027084528 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2010.04.048 | - FOLETTA VC; WHITE LJ; LARSEN AE; LEGER B; RUSSELL AP, "The role and regulation of MAFbx/atrogin-1 and MuRFl in skeletal muscle atrophy", PFLUGERS ARCH, (2011), vol. 461, doi:doi:10.1007/s00424-010-0919-9, pages 325 - 35, XP019881385 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00424-010-0919-9 | - GREINER D; BONALDI T; ESKELAND R; ROEMER E; IMHOF A, "Identification of a specific inhibitor of the histone methyltransferase SU(VAR)3-9", NAT CHEM BIO, (2005), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1038/nchembio721, pages 143 - 5, XP055023658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio721 | - CHOU JL; SU HY; CHEN LY; LIAO YP; HARTMAN-FREY C; LAI YH ET AL., "Promoter hypermethylation of FBX032, a novel TGF-beta/SMAD4 target gene and tumor suppressor, is associated with poor prognosis in human ovarian cancer", LAB INVEST, (2010), vol. 90, pages 414 - 25 | - NELSON JD; DENISENKO 0; BOMSZTYK K, "Protocol for the fast chromatin immunoprecipitation (ChIP) method", NAT PROTOC, (2006), vol. 1, pages 179 - 85 |