EP2992013 - ANTI-CD38 ANTIBODIES AND FUSIONS TO ATTENUATED INTERFERON ALPHA-2B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceuticals Australia Pty Ltd Level 2 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AU | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Adam 37 Epping Road Level 2 Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AU | 02 /
POLLARD, Matthew 37 Epping Road Level 2 Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AU | 03 /
DOYLE, Anthony, Gerard 37 Epping Road Level 2 Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AT | 04 /
BEHRENS, Collette 37 Epping Road Level 2 Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AU | 05 /
YAMAGISHI, Tetsuo 37 Epping Road Level 2 Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AU | 06 /
WILSON, David, S. Jr. 610 Galveston Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 07 /
POGUE, Sarah, L. 5471 Midday Common Freemont, CA 94555 / US | 08 /
TAURA, Tetsuya 514 Driscoll Place Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/49] |
Former [2016/10] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13721243.7 | 29.04.2013 | [2016/10] | WO2013US38659 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014178820 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2992013 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2992013 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K14/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K14/00 (IL);
C07K14/56 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | 13.11.2015 | ME | 13.11.2015 | Title | German: | ANTI-CD38-ANTIKÖRPER UND FUSIONEN DAVON MIT ABGESCHWÄCHTEM INTERFERON-ALPHA-2B | [2016/10] | English: | ANTI-CD38 ANTIBODIES AND FUSIONS TO ATTENUATED INTERFERON ALPHA-2B | [2016/10] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CD38 ET FUSIONS SUR UN INTERFÉRON ALPHA-2B ATTÉNUÉ | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19213030.0 / EP3677591 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2013 | AL | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | LU | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.04.2013 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO0197844 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]); | [I]US2002164788 (ELLIS JONATHAN HENRY [GB], et al); | [I]WO2005103083 (MORPHOSYS AG [DE], et al); | [I]WO2007042309 (MORPHOSYS AG [DE], et al); | [I]WO2011154453 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al); | [I]WO2012092612 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al); | [E]WO2013059885 (CEPHALON AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al) | by applicant | WO0042072 | WO0197844 | US2003039649 | US6602684 | US7083784 | US7217797 | WO2008006554 | US7326681 | US7388081 | US2009068175 | US2009092599 | US2009142340 | US7732578 | WO2012AU01323 |