EP2847258 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A DECORATIVE SHEET AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/12] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A DECORATED SHEET AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2016/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surface Technologies GmbH & Co. KG An der Birkenpfuhlheide 6 15837 Baruth / DE | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFF, Egon Im Baspelt 21 56869 Mastershausen / DE | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13721337.7 | 06.05.2013 | [2016/47] | WO2013EP59388 | Priority number, date | DE201210207845 | 10.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012207845 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013167533 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847258 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847258 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/24, D21H17/33, D21H27/28, B44C5/04, B32B29/06 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B32B29/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J5/24 (KR);
D21H25/02 (KR,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B37/18 (KR,US);
B32B38/004 (KR,US);
B32B38/06 (US);
B32B38/08 (KR,US);
B32B38/145 (KR,US);
B41F1/00 (US);
B41J2/00 (US);
B44C5/0446 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J5/245 (EP,CN,US);
D21H17/33 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D21H17/34 (EP,US);
D21H25/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D21H27/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2255/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2260/028 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2262/062 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2305/72 (KR,US);
B32B2307/4023 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/404 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2310/0825 (US);
B32B2310/0831 (US);
B32B2310/0862 (US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,CN,US);
B44C5/0469 (US);
C08J2300/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D21H17/49 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DEKORIERTEN BLATTES UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2015/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A DECORATIVE SHEET AND ITS USE | [2016/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE FEUILLE DÉCORATIVE ET SON UTILISATION | [2016/29] |
Former [2015/12] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A DECORATED SHEET AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2015/12] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FEUILLE À DÉCOR ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16158974.2 / EP3059276 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2013 | AL | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | MT | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | GB | 06.05.2017 | IE | 06.05.2017 | LU | 06.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.05.2013 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
GB | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 06.05.2013 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
GB | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.05.2013 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
GB | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
GB | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
GB | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 23.11.2016 | |
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 23.11.2016 | |
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JPH09188997 ; | [A]JPS5086571 ; | [A]EP0745478 (FORBO RESOPAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XAI]EP1319524 (ACKNER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] * [A] 9,10 [I] 2,3,5-8; | [XAI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 39, Database accession no. 1997-420800, XP002711478 & JPH09188997 A 19970722 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018] * * example 1 * [A] 9,10 [I] 5,7,8 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 52, Database accession no. 1975-85476W, XP002711479 & JPS5086571 A 19750711 (IBIGAWA ELECTRIC KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | JP2001129957 | DE102004034790 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 41, Database accession no. 2001-387240, & JP2001129957 A 20010515 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | DE1704598 | DE10134302 | WO2010089086 |