EP2704680 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/11] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRAINING DEVICE AND DEVICE FOR PROVIDING A DEFINED ROOM ATMOSPHERE | ||
[2014/35] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NL NANOMED Limited Griva Digeni 115 Trident Centre 3101 Limassol / CY | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENDZKO, Peter Ifflandstraße 32 12623 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Jörg Strasse 42 Nr. 19 13127 Berlin / DE | 03 /
ALBAKOV, Adam Novospassky pereulok 3 bld. 2 flat 21 Moskau 115172 / RU | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Sokolowski, Fabian, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13721601.6 | 02.04.2013 | WO2013EP56900 | Priority number, date | EP20120162522 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12162522 | EP20120178249 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12178249 | [2014/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144366 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2704680 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2704680 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G10/02, B01D53/30, A63B24/00, A61B5/08 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
A61G10/02 (EP);
A61B5/083 (EP);
A63B22/02 (EP);
A63B24/0087 (EP);
A61G10/04 (EP);
A63B2024/0093 (EP);
A63B22/0023 (EP);
A63B22/0605 (EP);
A63B22/0664 (EP);
A63B2213/005 (EP);
A63B2230/067 (EP);
A63B2230/205 (EP);
A63B2230/208 (EP);
B01D2257/102 (EP);
B01D2259/4508 (EP);
B01D2259/4533 (EP);
B01D53/04 (EP);
B01D53/0454 (EP);
B01D53/268 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES TRAININGSGERÄTS | [2014/35] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRAINING DEVICE | [2014/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES TRAININGSGERÄTS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER DEFINIERTEN RAUMATMOSPHÄRE | ||
Former [2014/11] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRAINING DEVICE AND DEVICE FOR PROVIDING A DEFINED ROOM ATMOSPHERE | ||
Former [2014/11] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE ATMOSPHÈRE AMBIANTE | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Observations by third parties | 02.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Dettmann, Kempen Buschiner Str. 35A 12683 Berlin / DE | [2016/06] | 02.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.07.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.12.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.01.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2013 | AL | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | RS | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | IE | 02.04.2015 | LU | 02.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | FR | 26.05.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.04.2013 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MK | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 02.04.2013 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 02.04.2013 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102007039124 (JERICHOW ULRICH [DE]) [I] 9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0023] , [0024] *; | [XYI]WO0216010 (EDGE4 LTD [GB], et al) [X] 10,11,14 * page 3, line 5 - line 14 * * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 20 * [Y] 15 [I] 12,13; | [X]WO2011087488 (PARK ANDREW D [US], et al) [X] 10,11,14 * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *; | [YA]DE10257155 (SPIEGEL VOLKER [DE]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0029] * [A] 10; | [A]JPH10216455 (TABAI ESPEC CORP) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003105995 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO) [A] 10 * abstract * | Examination | DE102007052776 | EP1825888 | US2004186389 | EP1055393 | DE4406286 | by applicant | DE102004034640 | WO0220136 | DE10257155 | WO9703631 | other | WO2013144366 | EP1789026 |