EP2841638 - LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAVARO, Daniele Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 I-33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
DEL POS, Maurizio Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 I-33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 13723013.2 | 23.04.2013 | [2016/42] | WO2013EP58355 | Priority number, date | EP20120165291 | 24.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12165291 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013160281 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2841638 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2841638 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00, A47L15/42 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
D06F39/007 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/022 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/028 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/088 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEWASCHMASCHINE | [2015/10] | English: | LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE | [2015/10] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER LE LINGE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 04.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2013 | AL | 19.10.2016 | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | GB | 23.04.2017 | IE | 23.04.2017 | LU | 23.04.2017 | MT | 23.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.04.2013 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
TR | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.04.2013 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.04.2013 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2013 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3521598 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,14 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005224100 (MAUNSELL STEPHEN R [NZ], et al) [I] 1,6-8 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]EP2113602 (HAIER GROUP CORP [CN], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3527182 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011154426 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP1085118 |