EP2850639 - EXCITATION OF REAGENT MOLECULES WITHIN A RF CONFINED ION GUIDE OR ION TRAP TO PERFORM ION MOLECULE, ION RADICAL OR ION-ION INTERACTION EXPERIMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micromass UK Limited Stamford Avenue Altrincham Road Wilmslow SK9 4AX / GB | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Martin Raymond Grangecroft 26 Grange Road Bowdon Cheshire WA14 3EE / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Jeffery Mark Dial House Old Hall Lane Mottram-in-Longdendale Hyde Cheshire SK14 6LT / GB | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13723925.7 | 16.05.2013 | [2016/14] | WO2013GB51264 | Priority number, date | GB20120008733 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: GB 201208733 | US201261651225P | 24.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261651225 P | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013171495 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2850639 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2850639 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/10, H01J49/24, H01J49/42, H01J49/00, H01J49/16, H01J49/14 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H01J49/0059 (EP,US);
H01J49/0045 (GB);
H01J49/422 (US);
H01J49/10 (US);
H01J49/145 (EP,US);
H01J49/162 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | H01J49/00, H01J49/16, H01J49/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANREGUNG VON REAGENZIENMOLEKÜLEN IN EINEM HF-BEGRENZTEN IONENLEITER ODER EINER IONENFALLE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON EXPERIMENTEN MIT IONENMOLEKÜLEN, IONENRADIKALEN ODER INTERAKTIONEN ZWISCHEN IONEN | [2015/13] | English: | EXCITATION OF REAGENT MOLECULES WITHIN A RF CONFINED ION GUIDE OR ION TRAP TO PERFORM ION MOLECULE, ION RADICAL OR ION-ION INTERACTION EXPERIMENTS | [2015/13] | French: | EXCITATION DE MOLÉCULES DE TYPE RÉACTIF DANS UN GUIDE D'IONS RF OU UN PIÈGE À IONS CONFINÉ POUR CONDUIRE DES EXPÉRIENCES D'INTERACTION ENTRE DES MOLÉCULE IONIQUES, DES RADICAUX IONIQUES OU IONS-IONS | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 16.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16160228.9 / EP3048635 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2013 | AL | 06.04.2016 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | IE | 16.05.2016 | LU | 16.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5396064 (WELLS GREGORY J [US]) [Y] 1-33 * column 2, line 4 - column 6, line 47; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2006107831 (WHITEHOUSE CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,10-32 * page 16, line 18 - page 18, line 14; figure 2 * * page 32, line 3 - page 33, line 5 *; | [A]WO2008142170 (PHYSIKRON [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,20-32* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009127808 (MICROMASS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4-9,33 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010096904 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [Y] 1-33 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 10; figures 2,3 *; | [Y] - POKE M J, "Characterization of Neutral Fragments in Tandem Mass Spectrometry: A Unique Route to Mechanistic and Structural Information", JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (19960101), vol. 31, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1096-9888(199610)31:10<1073::AID-JMS438>3.0.CO;2-X, ISSN 1076-5174, pages 1073 - 1085, XP007905461 [Y] 1-3,10-32 * page 1073 - page 1074 * * Section "Outlook"; page 1083 - page 1084 * * Section "Experimental"; page 1078 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9888(199610)31:10<1073::AID-JMS438>3.0.CO;2-X |