EP2836274 - HIGH-INTENSITY FOCUSED ULTRASOUND FOR HEATING A TARGET ZONE LARGER THAN THE ELECTRONIC FOCUSING ZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states The Government of the United States As represented by the Secretary of Health & Human Services 9000 Rockville Pike Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states The Government of the United States As represented by the Secretary of Health & Human Services, National Institutes of Health 9000 Rockville Pike Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARTANEN, Ari Ilkka Mikael c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DREHER, Matthew Robert c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
YARMOLENKO, Pavel Sergeyevich c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WOOD, Bradford Johns c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
CARVAJAL GALLARDO, Elma Natalia c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/29] |
Former [2015/08] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13724882.9 | 09.04.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013IB52806 | Priority number, date | US201261623355P | 12.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261623355 P | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013153506 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836274 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836274 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/02, A61B34/10, A61B90/00, A61B5/01 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
A61B5/0036 (EP,US);
A61B5/015 (RU,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (RU,US);
A61B5/7253 (RU,US);
A61B5/7264 (US);
A61N7/02 (EP,RU,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | A61N7/02, A61B19/00, A61B18/00, A61B17/00, A61N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHINTENSIVER FOKUSSIERTER ULTRASCHALL ZUR ERWÄRMUNG EINES GRÖSSEREN ZIELBEREICHS ALS DIE ELEKTRONISCHE FOKUSSIERUNGSZONE | [2015/08] | English: | HIGH-INTENSITY FOCUSED ULTRASOUND FOR HEATING A TARGET ZONE LARGER THAN THE ELECTRONIC FOCUSING ZONE | [2015/08] | French: | ULTRASON FOCALISÉ DE HAUTE DENSITÉ POUR CHAUFFER UNE ZONE CIBLE PLUS GRANDE QUE LA ZONE DE FOCALISATION ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2013 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 09.04.2017 | LU | 09.04.2017 | MT | 09.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009198131 (FEDEWA RUSSELL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0050]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0055]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3c-d *; | [A]US2010210976 (DARLINGTON GREGORY P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0067]; figure 3j * * paragraph [0084]; figures 6c-d *; | [A]US2011087103 (GROSS PATRICK [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0006] *; | [A] - KÃHLER MAX ET AL, "Volumetric HIFU ablation under 3D guidance of rapid MRI thermometry", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20090701), vol. 36, no. 8, doi:10.1118/1.3152112, ISSN 0094-2405, ISBN 978-1-930524-56-9, pages 3521 - 3535, XP012130141 [A] 1-15 * page 3522, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3523, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3523, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 3524, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3152112 | Examination | EP2500740 | WO2012123880 | by applicant | - M. O. KOHLER; C. MOUGENOT; B. QUESSON ET AL., "Volumetric HIFU ablation under 3D guidance of rapid MRI thermometry", MED PHYS, (200908), vol. 36, no. 8, pages 3521 - 35 | - R. STARUCH; R. CHOPRA; K. HYNYNEN, "Localised drug release using MRI- controlled focused ultrasound hyperthermia", INT J HYPERTHERMIA, (2011), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 156 - 71 | - P. M. HARARI; K. H. HYNYNEN; R. B. ROEMER ET AL., "Development of scanned focussed ultrasound hyperthermia: clinical response evaluation", INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (199108), vol. 21, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0360-3016(91)90705-9, pages 831 - 40, XP026889556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-3016(91)90705-9 | - J. K. ENHOLM; M. O. KOHLER; B. QUESSON ET AL., "Improved volumetric MR-HIFU ablation by robust binary feedback control", IEEE TRANS BIOMED ENG, (201001), vol. 57, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/TBME.2009.2034636, pages 103 - 13, XP011343137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2009.2034636 |