06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
12.11.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
17.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
27.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
04.12.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.11.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.08.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.07.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.06.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
02.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
16.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
04.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
14.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|