Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10006760 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2018 | B2 | US2015107292 | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 | WO2013IB52986 | 15.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2870322 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | C | CA2870322 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 | WO2013IB52986 | 15.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2836775 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP2836775 | 18.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 | WO2013IB52986 | 15.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN205090700U | 16.03.2016 | U | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 | WO2013IB52986 | 15.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2855128T | 23.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 | WO2013IB52986 | 15.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013153545 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1020620 | 04.02.2014 | A5 | Priority number | Date | BE201200250 | 13.04.2012 |