Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014191052 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61296 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10142765 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2018 | B2 | US2016112824 | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61296 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3005739 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP3005739 | 13.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61296 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2742029T | 12.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61296 | 31.05.2013 |