EP2831871 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE PERCEIVED QUALITY OF SOUND REPRODUCTION BY COMBINING ACTIVE NOISE CANCELLATION AND PERCEPTUAL NOISE COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UHLE, Christian Hohen Rain 28 92289 Urensollen / DE | 02 /
HERRE, Jürgen Hallerstrasse 24 91054 Buckenhof / DE | 03 /
WALTHER, Andreas Merkurweg 13 90537 Feucht / DE | 04 /
FLEISCHMANN, Felix Am Haselgraben 23 90547 Stein / DE | 05 /
GAMPP, Patrick Eskilstunastraße 29 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2015/26] |
Former [2015/06] | 01 /
UHLE, Christian Kuenhoferstrasse 7 90489 Nuernberg / DE | ||
02 /
HERRE, Jürgen Hallerstrasse 24 91054 Buckenhof / DE | |||
03 /
WALTHER, Andreas Chemin de Tout-Vent 2 CH-1023 Crissier / CH | |||
04 /
FLEISCHMANN, Felix Am Haselgraben 23 90547 Stein / DE | |||
05 /
GAMPP, Patrick Eskilstunastraße 29 91054 Erlangen / DE | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/26] |
Former [2015/06] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13726121.0 | 25.03.2013 | [2021/26] | WO2013EP56314 | Priority number, date | US201261615446P | 26.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261615446 P | EP20120169608 | 25.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12169608 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144099 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831871 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2831871 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
G10K11/17823 (EP,US);
G10K11/178 (KR);
G10K11/17837 (EP,US);
G10K11/17854 (EP,US);
G10K11/17857 (EP,US);
G10K11/17881 (EP,US);
G10K11/17885 (EP,US);
H04R3/002 (KR,US);
G10K11/00 (RU);
G10K2210/1081 (EP,KR,US);
G10K2210/3014 (EP,KR,US);
G10K2210/509 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2460/01 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER EMPFUNDENEN TONQUALITÄTSWIEDERGABE DURCH KOMBINATION VON AKTIVER RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG UND WAHRNEHMUNGSRAUSCHKOMPENSATION | [2021/02] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE PERCEIVED QUALITY OF SOUND REPRODUCTION BY COMBINING ACTIVE NOISE CANCELLATION AND PERCEPTUAL NOISE COMPENSATION | [2015/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA QUALITÉ DE REPRODUCTION SONORE PERÇUE EN COMBINANT L'ANNULATION ACTIVE DE BRUIT ET LA COMPENSATION PERCEPTUELLE DE BRUIT | [2021/02] |
Former [2015/06] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER WAHRGENOMMENEN KLANGQUALITÄTSWIEDERGABE DURCH KOMBINATION VON AKTIVER RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG UND WAHRNEHMUNGSRAUSCHKOMPENSATION | ||
Former [2015/06] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À AMÉLIORER LA QUALITÉ PERÇUE DE REPRODUCTION SONORE EN COMBINANT LA SUPPRESSION ACTIVE DU BRUIT ET LA COMPENSATION DU BRUIT PERCEPTIF | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 11.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2020 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2013 | AL | 30.06.2021 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | IE | 25.03.2022 | LU | 25.03.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03015082 (DSP FACTORY LTD [CA], et al) [AD] 1-17 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 17 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, line 3 - line 12 * * page 9, line 9 - line 29 * * page 10, line 19 - line 22 * * page 12, line 1 - line 16 * * page 13, line 3 - line 10 * * page 14, line 10 - page 15, line 7 ** page 17, line 17 - page 18, line 20 *; | [A]WO2005011111 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 3, lines 20-34 * * page 4, line 20 - line 32 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 16 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 33 *; | [A]EP1619793 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006125061 (BOSE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0035] - [0090] - [0091] - [0093] - [0094] - [0096] , [0103] - [0104] - [0151] *; | [XAI]EP1770685 (MAYSOUND APS [DK]) [X] 1,2,7,8,16,17 * the whole document * [A] 9,11,12 [I] 3-6,10,13-15; | [A]US2010017205 (VISSER ERIK [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0115] - [0119] - [0122] , [0131] , [0150] - [0154] - [0158] - [0160] *; | [A]EP2284831 (NXP BV [NL]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0009] , [0017] - [0026] - [0043] - [0045] - [0060] - [0062] *; | [A]US2011251704 (WALSH MARTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0027] , [0031] - [0033] - [0037] - [0057] - [0083] *; | [XAI]US2011293103 (PARK HYUN JIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-12,16,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0094] - [0124] - [0172] - [0180] - [0266] * [A] 9 [I] 3-6,13-15 |