|
06.12.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
27.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
21.05.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.05.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Notification of transmittal of demand to the competent IPEA |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.02.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.02.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
24.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
24 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |