Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9987668 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2018 | B2 | US2015298182 | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61464 | 04.06.2013 | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105307787B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2017 | B | CN105307787 | 03.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61464 | 04.06.2013 | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2916971 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP2916971 | 16.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61464 | 04.06.2013 | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | EP13726543 | 04.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015010180 | 29.09.2020 | B1 | BR112015010180 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61464 | 04.06.2013 | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2916971T | 21.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61464 | 04.06.2013 | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2813865T | 25.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP61464 | 04.06.2013 | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014072087 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2730345 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B1 | EP2730345 | 14.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2730345T | 24.10.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2585815T | 10.10.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12191805 | 08.11.2012 |