|
19.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
93 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
84 |